Global Patent Index - EP 0978327 A2

EP 0978327 A2 2000-02-09 - Screening machine

Title (en)

Screening machine

Title (de)

Siebmaschine

Title (fr)

Appareil à tamiser

Publication

EP 0978327 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99110456 A

Priority

DE 19834894 A

Abstract (en)

The screening machine has several parallel spaced transverse supports (2) between which the flexible screen coverings (3) are fixed. Force transfer elements (4) such as gearwheels and wheel segments are fixed at the ends of the supports and a driven draw element (5) and/or push element (8) run over the wheels so as to adjoin the first supports on the underneath of the wheels and the second supports on the top side of the wheel. The draw element can be a toothed belt with teeth on both sides.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Siebmaschine (1) mit mehreren parallel nebeneinander und in Abständen angeordneten Querträgern (2), zwischen denen flexible Siebbeläge (3) befestigt sind und von denen jeder zweite Querträger (erste Querträger)(2a) relativ zu den dazwischen liegenden Querträgern (zweite Querträger)(2b) um die Längsachse hin und her kippbar sind, wobei die dazwischen liegenden zweiten Querträger (2b) entgegengesetzt zu den ersten Querträgern (2a) um die Längsachse hin und her kippbar sind, um die Siebbeläge (3) abwechselnd zu strecken und zu stauchen. An den Enden der Querträger sind Kraftübertragungselemente (4), insbesondere Räder oder Radsegmente befestigt sind, über die mindestens ein angetriebenes Zugelement (5) und/oder ein Schubelement (8) läuft, das/die bei den ersten Querträgern (2a) auf der Unterseite und bei den zweiten Querträgern (2b) auf der Oberseite der Kraftübertragungselemente anliegt/anliegen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B07B 1/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B07B 1/28 (2006.01); B07B 1/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B07B 1/485 (2013.01); B07B 1/28 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0978327 A2 20000209; EP 0978327 A3 20010131; EP 0978327 B1 20021127; AT 228397 T 20021215; DE 19834894 A1 20000210

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090529

2010-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090531

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091201

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090529

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090602

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080514

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-02-26 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091201

2010-02-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100129

2010-02-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20091201

2010-01-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090529

2010-01-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090529

2009-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *HEIN LEHMANN TRENN- UND FORDERTECHNIK G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20090531

2009-03-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20081128

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080604

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20080501

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080529

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-08-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20080514

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080605

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-11-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030828

2003-06-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-03-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030217

2003-01-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59903521 20030109

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR GB IT NL

2002-11-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 228397 T 20021215

2002-07-31 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR GB IT NL

2002-06-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020503

2001-10-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI LU NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010222

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR GB IT NL

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-02-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI