Global Patent Index - EP 0978356 A3

EP 0978356 A3 2001-01-31 - Tool-bit magazine for hand tool

Title (en)

Tool-bit magazine for hand tool

Title (de)

Bits-Magazin eines Handwerkzeugs

Title (fr)

Magasin pour les plaquettes d'un outil à main

Publication

EP 0978356 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99305452 A

Priority

  • CA 2334439 A
  • GB 9816876 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0978356A2] A sleeve (18) is rotated to a position in which an aperture (21) is in register with a tool-bit receiving recess (8) in a body (7) rotatably mounted on the shaft (1) of a hand tool such as a screwdriver, so that a tool-bit (9) can be removed from or inserted into that recess in a direction transverse to the axis of the shaft (1). The sleeve (18) surrounds a rear end portion of the body (7) so as to prevent escape of tool-bits from the recesses (8) while leaving the tool-bits partly visible. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25G 1/08; B25B 15/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25B 15/04 (2006.01); B25G 1/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25B 15/04 (2013.01); B25G 1/085 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0978356 A2 20000209; EP 0978356 A3 20010131; EP 0978356 B1 20050921; CN 1251795 A 20000503; GB 2340059 A 20000216; GB 9816876 D0 19980930; TW 388733 B 20000501

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160706

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160705

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160613

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-06-13 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2006-08-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060622

2006-06-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-02-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69927329 P 20060202

2005-10-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69927329 P 20051027

2005-09-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2005-09-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-03-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040128

2001-10-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2001-04-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010226

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-31 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 25G 1/08 A, 7B 25B 15/04 B

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-02-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI