Global Patent Index - EP 0978360 A2

EP 0978360 A2 2000-02-09 - Method and apparatus for the manufacture of parquet flooring

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for the manufacture of parquet flooring

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung von Parkettdielen

Title (fr)

Procédé et appareil pour la fabrication de parquets finis

Publication

EP 0978360 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99111391 A

Priority

DE 19834895 A

Abstract (en)

The floor laying process is for floors consisting of an underlay, and intermediate layer and a top layer. The intermediate layer consists of numerous bars (4) laid alongside each other, transversely to the floor length direction. The bars in the middle layer, with the exception of those running along the edge, should at least partly be laid spaced out from each other. The device used has a running track (8) on which the bars are laid, running horizontally under a pusher (10), which can travel horizontally, recoiling when necessary to provide the spacing between the bars.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft die Herstellung von Parkettdielen, wobei die Parkettdielen zumindest aus einer Unterlage, einer Zwischenlage und einer Deckschicht bestehen und die Zwischenlage aus zahlreichen nebeneinander angeordneten Stäben (4) gebildet wird, die quer zur Dielenlängsrichtung angeordnet sind. Wesentlich ist, daß die Stäbe (4) der Mittellage mit Ausnahme der am Rand verlaufenden Stäbe zumindest teilweise voneinander beabstandet verlegt sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B27M 3/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B27M 3/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B27M 3/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FI FR IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0978360 A2 20000209; EP 0978360 A3 20040407; EP 0978360 B1 20050914; AT 304434 T 20050915; DE 19834895 A1 20000210; DE 59912544 D1 20051020

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160620

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160615

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130701

2014-03-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20140228

2014-02-28 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130611

2014-02-04 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2014-01-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130612

2012-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120625

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120705

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-08-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120620

- Year of fee payment: 14

2006-08-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060615

2006-06-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-12-27 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2005-10-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59912544

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-10-20

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-09-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI FR IT SE

2004-12-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI FR IT SE

2004-07-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20040514

2004-04-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-04-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI