Global Patent Index - EP 0978371 A1

EP 0978371 A1 2000-02-09 - Method of reinforcing the load carrying sidewalls of trays of corrugated cardboard and tray so obtained

Title (en)

Method of reinforcing the load carrying sidewalls of trays of corrugated cardboard and tray so obtained

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Verstärkung der tragenden Seitenwand einer Steige aus Wellpappe sowie nach dem Verfahren hergestellter Artikel

Title (fr)

Procédé de renforcement de parois porteuses d'un conditionnement en carton ondulé et conditionnement obtenu par ce procédé

Publication

EP 0978371 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99401918 A

Priority

FR 9810122 A

Abstract (en)

The procedure consists of making a straight cut (28) through the layers (14, 16) of the side wall flap, leaving only the outer layer (18) uncut. When the side wall is folded upwards relative to the base (22) of the tray along fold line (26) its upper section (32) above the cut is folded over outwards and glued to give a wall of double thickness with the corrugated cardboard channels running vertically through it. The position of the cut (28) is selected so that the free edge (27) of the outer section lies flush with the underside (40) of the tray base when folded.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne un procédé de renforcement des parois porteuses d'un conditionnement réalisé à partir d'un flan en carton ondulé, dans lequel chacune des parois porteuses est constituée par un volet (24) articulé sur la paroi de fond (22) du conditionnement par une ligne de pliage (26). Le procédé consiste à pratiquer sur la face intérieure du volet (24), sensiblement à égale distance entre son bord libre (27) et ladite ligne de pliage, une coupe rectiligne à mi-chair (28) qui définit sur le volet une paroi latérale (30) et un rabat (32) ; à dresser le volet (24) perpendiculairement à la paroi de fond (22) ; à plier le rabat (32) vers l'extérieur du conditionnement et à le coller sur la face extérieure de la paroi latérale. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B31B 15/00; B65D 21/02; B31B 1/25

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B31B 1/25 (2006.01); B31B 3/26 (2006.01); B31B 15/00 (2006.01); B65D 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 5/0025 (2013.01); B31B 50/25 (2017.08); B31B 2105/00 (2017.08); B31B 2110/30 (2017.08); B31B 2120/50 (2017.08)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0978371 A1 20000209; EP 0978371 B1 20021120; DE 69904001 D1 20030102; DE 69904001 T2 20030508; ES 2188113 T3 20030616; FR 2782031 A1 20000211; FR 2782031 B1 20001103

INPADOC legal status


2012-09-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100201

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090727

2010-10-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090728

2010-09-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090728

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100202

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090727

2010-04-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100201

2010-03-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090727

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080722

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-11-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080724

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-11-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20080716

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080722

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080729

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-11-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030821

2003-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2188113 T3

2003-01-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69904001 20030102

2002-12-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021120

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT NL

2002-11-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-06-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020506

2000-10-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES GB IT NL

2000-09-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000713

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT NL

2000-02-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI