Global patent index - EP 0978375 A2

EP 0978375 A2 2000-02-09 - Radiation-sensitive mixture comprising IR-absorbing, anionic cyanine dyes and recording material prepared therewith

Title (en)

Radiation-sensitive mixture comprising IR-absorbing, anionic cyanine dyes and recording material prepared therewith

Title (de)

Strahlungsempfindliches Gemisch mit IR-absorbierenden, anionischen Cyaninfarbstoffen und damit hergestelltes Aufzeichnungsmaterial

Title (fr)

Mélange sensible aux rayons actiniques contenant des colorants cyanines anioniques absorbant des rayons infrarouges et matériau pour l'enregistrement préparé avec ce mélange

Publication

EP 0978375 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99114553 A

Priority

DE 19834745 A

Abstract (en)

Positive radiation-sensitive mixture containing a water-insoluble organic polymeric binder, which dissolves or at least swells in aqueous alkaline solution, contains, as infrared (IR)-absorbing dye, an anionic penta- or hepta-methin cyanine dye (I). Positive radiation-sensitive mixture containing a water-insoluble organic polymeric binder, which dissolves or at least swells in aqueous alkaline solution, contains, as infrared (IR)-absorbing dye, an anionic penta- or hepta-methin cyanine dye of formula (I), which contains 2-4 sulfonate, carboxylate and/or phosphonate groups but a total of no more than 2 sulfonate groups; n = 2 or 3; R<1-8> = hydrogen (H), R or 6-10 C aryl, optionally mono- or poly substituted by R; R = halogen, sulfonate, carboxylate, phosphonate, hydroxyl (OH), 1-4 carbon (C) alkoxy, nitro, amino, mono- or di-(1-4 C alkyl)-amino; R<9>, R<10> = linear or branched 1-6 C alkyl, 7-16 C aralkyl or 6-10 C aryl, optionally mono- or poly substituted by R; R<11>, R<12> = optionally substituted 1-4 C alkyl or 6-10 C aryl; Z<1>, Z<2> = sulfur (S), di-(1-4 C alkyl)methylene or ethen-1,2-diyl; X<-> = an anion.

Abstract (de)

Beschrieben ist ein positiv arbeitendes, strahlungsempfindliches Gemisch, das ein in Wasser unlösliches, in wäßrig-alkalischer Lösung dagegen lösliches oder zumindest quellbares, organisches, polymeres Bindemittel und mindestens einen IR-absorbierenden Farbstoff enthält, dadurch gekennzeichnet, daß der IR-absorbierende Farbstoff ein anionischer Cyaninfarbstoff der Formel I ist <IMAGE> worin n: 2 oder 3 ist; R<1> bis R<8>: unabhängig voneinander ein Wasserstoff- oder Halogenatom, eine Sulfonat-, Carboxylat-, Phosphonat-, Hydroxy-, (C1-C4)Alkoxy-, Nitro-, Amino-, (C1-C4)Alkylamino-, Di(C1-C4)alkylaminogruppe oder eine (C6-C10)Arylgruppe, die gegebenenfalls ihrerseits mit einem oder mehreren Halogenatomen und/oder einer oder mehreren Sulfonat-, Carboxylat-, Phosphonat-, Hydroxy-, (C1-C4)Alkoxy-, Nitro-, Amino-, (C1-C4)Alkylamino- und/oder Di(C1-C4)alkylaminogruppen substituiert ist, darstellen, R<9> und R<10>: unabhängig voneinander eine geradkettige oder verzweigte (C1-C6)Alkyl-, eine (C7-C16)Aralkyl- oder eine (C6-C10)Arylgruppe, die jeweils gegebenenfalls ihrerseits mit einem oder mehreren Halogenatomen und/oder einer oder mehreren Sulfonat-, Carboxylat-, Phosphonat-, Hydroxy-, (C1-C4)Alkoxy-, Nitro-, Amino-, (C1-C4)Alkylamino- und/oder Di(C1-C4)alkylaminogruppen substituiert sind, darstellen, Z<1> und Z<2>: unabhängig voneinander ein Schwefelatom, eine Di(C1-C4)alkyl-methylengruppe oder eine Ethen-1,2-diylgruppe darstellen und; X<->: ein Kation darstellt, mit der Maßgabe, daß der Farbstoff 2 bis 4 Sulfonat-, Carboxylat- und/oder Phosphonatgruppen, insgesamt jedoch nicht mehr als zwei Sulfonatgruppen enthält. Offenbart ist daneben ein tageslichtunempfändliches, IR-bebilderbares Aufzeichnungsmaterial mit einem Träger und einer Schicht aus dem Gemisch. Nach bildmäßigem Bestrahlen, insbesondere mit IR-Laserstrahlen, und Entwickeln mit einer wäßrig-alkalischen Lösung entsteht daraus eine Offsetdruckplatte.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41C 1/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03F 7/039 (2006.01); B41C 1/10 (2006.01); C09B 23/00 (2006.01); G03F 7/00 (2006.01); G03F 7/004 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41C 1/1008 (2013.01); B41C 1/1016 (2013.01); B41C 2201/02 (2013.01); B41C 2201/14 (2013.01); B41C 2210/02 (2013.01); B41C 2210/06 (2013.01); B41C 2210/20 (2013.01); B41C 2210/22 (2013.01); B41C 2210/24 (2013.01); B41C 2210/262 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 19834745 A1 20000203; EP 0978375 A2 20000209; EP 0978375 A3 20010912; EP 0978375 B1 20041020; JP 2000206695 A 20000728; US 6238838 B1 20010529

INPADOC legal status

2011-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100724

2011-05-19 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59910884

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110201

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110201

2011-03-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20100724

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090622

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090622

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-04-04 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2007-03-07 [REG GB 746] REGISTER NOTED 'LICENCES OF RIGHT' (SECT. 46/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 746

- Effective date: 20070213

2005-12-16 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2005-10-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050721

2005-01-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20041216

2004-11-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59910884

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-11-25

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-10-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-10-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-10-20 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041020

2003-04-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030214

2002-06-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2002-05-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020312

2001-12-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AGFA-GEVAERT

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-09-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI