Global patent index - EP 0978376 A2

EP 0978376 A2 2000-02-09 - Radiation-sensitive recording material comprising IR-absorbing cyanine dyes having a betaine structure or having a betaine structure and containing an anion, and recording material prepared therewith

Title (en)

Radiation-sensitive recording material comprising IR-absorbing cyanine dyes having a betaine structure or having a betaine structure and containing an anion, and recording material prepared therewith

Title (de)

Strahlungsempfindlisches Aufzeichnungsmaterial mit IR-absorbierenden, betainischen oder betainisch-anionischen Cyaninfarbstoffen und damit hergestelltes Aufzeichnungsmaterial

Title (fr)

Produit d'enregistrement sensible aux rayons actiniques contenant des colorants cyanines absorbant des rayons infrarouges et ayant une structure bétaine ou ayant une structure bétaine et contenant un anion, et matériau pour l'enregistrement préparé à partir de ce produit

Publication

EP 0978376 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99114554 A

Priority

DE 19834746 A

Abstract (en)

Positive radiation-sensitive mixture containing a water-insoluble organic polymeric binder, which dissolves or at least swells in aqueous alkaline solution, contains, as infrared (IR)-absorbing dye, a betaine or betaine anionic cyanine dye (I) with a pyrimidin-2,4,6-trion-6-yl-substituted (poly)methin group. Positive radiation-sensitive mixture containing a water-insoluble organic polymeric binder, which dissolves or at least swells in aqueous alkaline solution, contains, as infrared (IR)-absorbing dye, a betaine or betaine anionic cyanine dye of formula (I): with a pyrimidin-2,4,6-trion-6-yl-substituted (poly)methin group; R<1-8> = hydrogen (H), R or 6-10 C aryl, optionally mono- or poly-substituted by R; R = halogen, sulfonate, carboxylate, phosphonate, hydroxyl (OH), 1-4 carbon (C) alkoxy, nitro, amino or mono- or di-(1-4 C alkyl)-amino; R<9>, R<10> = linear or branched 1-6 C alkyl, 7-16 C aralkyl or 6-10 C aryl, optionally mono- or poly-substituted by R; R<11>, R<12> = optionally substituted 1-4 C alkyl or 6-10 C aryl; Z<1>, Z<2> = sulfur (S), di-(1-4 C alkyl)methylene or ethen-1,2-diyl; A = C or a chain with conjugated double bonds forming a delocalized pi -electron system between the quaternary nitrogen (N) atoms of the 3H-indolium, quinolinium or benzothiazolium group and the enolate oxygen (I) atom of the pyrimidin-2,4,6-trione group.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein positiv arbeitendes, strahlungsempfindliches Gemisch, das ein in Wasser unlösliches, in wäßrig-alkalischer Lösung dagegen lösliches oder zumindest quellbares organisches polymeres Bindemittel und mindestens einen IR-absorbierenden betainischer oder betainisch-anionischer Cyaninfarbstoff der Formel (I) <IMAGE> enthält, worin R<1> bis R<8>: unabhängig voneinander ein Wasserstoff- oder Halogenatom, eine Sulfonat-, Carboxylat-, Phosphonat-, Hydroxy-, (C1-C4)Alkoxy-, Nitro-, Amino-, (C1-C4)Alkylamino-, Di(C1-C4)alkylaminogruppe oder eine (C6-C10)-Arylgruppe, die gegebenenfalls ihrerseits mit einem oder mehreren Halogenatomen und/oder einer oder mehreren Sulfonat-, Carboxylat-, Phosphonat-, Hydroxy- , (C1-C4)Alkoxy-, Nitro-, Amino-, (C1-C4)Alkylamino- und/oder Di(C1 -C4)alkylaminogruppen substituiert ist, darstellen, R<9> und R<10>: unabhängig voneinander eine geradkettige oder verzweigte (C1-C6)Alkyl-, eine (C7-C16)Aralkyl- oder eine (C6-C10)Arylgruppe, die jeweils gegebenenfalls ihrerseits mit einem oder mehreren Halogenatomen und/oder einer oder mehreren Sulfonat-, Carboxylat-, Phosphonat-, Hydroxy-, (C1-C4)Alkoxy-, Nitro-, Amino-, (C1-C4)Alkylamino- und/oder Di(C1-C4)alkylaminogruppe/n substituiert ist, darstellen, R<11> und R<12>: unabhängig voneinander (C1-C4)Alkyl- oder (C6-C10)Arylgruppen darstellen, die ihrerseits substituiert sein können, Z<1> und Z<2>: unabhängig voneinander ein Schwefelatom, eine Di(C1-C4)alkylmethylengruppe oder eine Ethen-1,2-diylgruppe darstellen und; A: ein Kohlenstoffatom oder eine Kette mit konjugierten Doppelbindungen darstellt, die die Bildung eines delokalisierten -Elektronensystems zwischen dem quartären Stickstoffatom des 3H-Indolium-, Chinolinium- oder Benzothiazoliumrests und dem Enolat-Sauerstoffatom des Pyrimidin-2,4,6-trionrests bewirkt. Das mit diesem Gemisch hergestellte Aufzeichnungsmaterial läßt sich nach der bildmäßigen Laserbelichtung problemlos ohne zusätzliche Verarbeitungsschritte (wie Nacherwärmung oder Nachbelichtung) mit einer wäßrig-alkalischen Lösung entwickeln. Außerdem betrifft die Erfindung ein Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Druckform für den Offsetdruck aus dem erfindungsgemäßen Aufzeichnungsmaterial.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41C 1/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03F 7/004 (2006.01); B41C 1/10 (2006.01); G03F 7/00 (2006.01); G03F 7/039 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41C 1/1008 (2013.01); B41C 1/1016 (2013.01); B41C 2201/02 (2013.01); B41C 2201/14 (2013.01); B41C 2210/02 (2013.01); B41C 2210/06 (2013.01); B41C 2210/20 (2013.01); B41C 2210/22 (2013.01); B41C 2210/24 (2013.01); B41C 2210/262 (2013.01); Y10S 430/106 (2013.01); Y10S 430/127 (2013.01); Y10S 430/145 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 19834746 A1 20000203; EP 0978376 A2 20000209; EP 0978376 A3 20010912; EP 0978376 B1 20050309; JP 2000206687 A 20000728; JP 4259685 B2 20090430; US 2002006575 A1 20020117; US 6492093 B2 20021210

INPADOC legal status

2016-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150731

2016-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160202

2016-04-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150724

2016-04-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20160331

2016-03-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20150724

2016-02-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59911722

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140613

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140613

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140613

- Year of fee payment: 16

2008-12-12 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2007-04-04 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2006-03-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20051212

2005-12-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-07-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20050614

2005-04-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59911722

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-04-14

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-03-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2005-03-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-05-19 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: RADIATION-SENSITIVE RECORDING MATERIAL COMPRISING IR-ABSORBING CYANINE DYES HAVING A BETAINE STRUCTURE OR HAVING A BETAIN

2003-04-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030214

2002-06-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2002-05-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020312

2001-12-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AGFA-GEVAERT

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-09-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI