Global Patent Index - EP 0978378 A2

EP 0978378 A2 2000-02-09 - Method and device for maintaining an ink profile similar to the final run

Title (en)

Method and device for maintaining an ink profile similar to the final run

Title (de)

Verfahren und Einrichtung zur Erhaltung eines dem Fortdruck nahen Farbprofils

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour maintenir un profil d'encrage semblable du tirage final

Publication

EP 0978378 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99112533 A

Priority

DE 19834784 A

Abstract (en)

An offset cylinder (3) operates with a printing cylinder (1) and a form cylinder (4) fitted with a printing platen (5) fed to the form cylinder by a swiveling cassette (6). The form cylinder inks the printing platen with a dampening unit and an inking unit (9), containing form inking rollers (11) linked to the form cylinder, transmission rollers (12) and an ink dispenser (13) to feed ink from an ink fountain (14) to one of the transmission rollers.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren und eine Einrichtung zur Erhaltung eines dem Fortdruck nahen Farbprofils in Farbwerken (9) von Druckmaschinen. Ausgehend von der Aufgabe der Erfindung - Schaffung eines Verfahrens und einer Einrichtung zur Erhaltung eines dem Fortdruck nahen Farbprofils - wird bei dem Verfahren zur Erhaltung eines mittels eines Farbeinlaufprozesses erzeugten, dem Fortdruck nahen Farbprofils in eine Farbdosiereinrichtung (13) und eine Walzengruppe mit Reibwalzen (12), Übertragungswalzen (12) und Auftragwalzen (11) enthaltenden Farbwerken von Druckmaschinen bei verzögertem Druckbeginn nach dem Farbeinlaufprozeß der Antrieb des Farbwerkes für den Zeitraum Ende des Farbeinlaufprozesses und verzögertem Druckbeginn unterbrochen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 31/00; B41F 33/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 31/30 (2006.01); B41F 31/14 (2006.01); B41F 33/10 (2006.01); B41F 33/16 (2006.01); B41M 1/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 33/10 (2013.01); B41M 1/14 (2013.01); B41P 2233/11 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19834784 A1 20000203; EP 0978378 A2 20000209; EP 0978378 A3 20000607; EP 0978378 B1 20030827; JP 2000052537 A 20000222; US 6758141 B1 20040706

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160912

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-08-25 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: KOENIG & BAUER AG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: KOENIG & BAUER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, 97080 WUERZBURG, DE

- Document: DE 59906751

2011-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100701

2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100802

2011-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100701

2011-04-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110331

2011-03-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100701

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090725

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090720

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090716

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-08-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040528

2004-05-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-01-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031217

2003-10-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59906751 P 20031002

2003-08-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-08-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-01-15 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD FOR MAINTAINING AN INK PROFILE SIMILAR TO THE FINAL RUN

2001-04-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010226

2001-02-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2000-07-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000510

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 41F 31/00 A, 7B 41F 33/00 B, 7B 41F 33/10 B

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-02-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI