Global Patent Index - EP 0978381 A3

EP 0978381 A3 2000-06-07 - Method and device for garanteeing safe work

Title (en)

Method and device for garanteeing safe work

Title (de)

Verfahren und Einrichtung zur Gewährleistung der Arbeitssicherheit

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour garantir la sécurité du travail

Publication

EP 0978381 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99112532 A

Priority

DE 19834783 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0978381A2] The method and appliance for ensuring safety in printers during the automatic or semi-automatic changeover of printing plate (5) consists of the line (14) of drive wheels belonging to the inker unit (9) being connected to the cog wheel (13) of the printing cylinder. (1). While the printing cylinder is being changed, the inker unit is brought to a standstill by a coupling positioned between a first wheel engaging with the cog wheel of the printing cylinder and a second wheel engaging with the drive wheels of the inker unit

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 33/10; B41F 33/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 33/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 33/0018 (2013.01); B41P 2227/00 (2013.01); B41P 2227/62 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19834783 A1 20000203; EP 0978381 A2 20000209; EP 0978381 A3 20000607

INPADOC legal status


2002-06-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20011206

2001-04-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010222

2001-02-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2000-07-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000510

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-02-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI