Global Patent Index - EP 0978386 A3

EP 0978386 A3 2001-03-07 - Thermal transfer printer

Title (en)

Thermal transfer printer

Title (de)

Thermotransfer-Druckvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Imprimante par transfert thermique

Publication

EP 0978386 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99250237 A

Priority

DE 19835544 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0978386A2] A thermo transfer printing unit for franking and address machines, comprises a corner edge printing head (1) with heating elements on one edge of a printing slat, and a roller (3). A housing section (2) is located against the roller and extends to the printing slat. The base adjacent to the slat is at the same height. The printing head, housing and roller can be moved w.r.t. each other.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/335

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/325 (2006.01); B41J 2/335 (2006.01); G07B 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/3353 (2013.01); B41J 2/325 (2013.01); B41J 2/3355 (2013.01); B41J 2/33565 (2013.01); G07B 17/00467 (2013.01); G07B 17/00508 (2013.01); G07B 2017/0054 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0978386 A2 20000209; EP 0978386 A3 20010307; EP 0978386 B1 20020814; DE 19835544 C1 20001026; US 6052139 A 20000418

INPADOC legal status


2013-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120715

2013-05-16 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59902325

- Effective date: 20130201

2013-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120715

2013-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120731

2013-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120731

2013-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130201

2013-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120731

2013-04-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130329

2013-03-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120715

2013-02-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2012-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110517

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-12-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110722

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110721

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110729

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20110725

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-09-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA AG & CO. KG

- Free text: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA AG & CO. KG#TRIFTWEG 21-26#16547 BIRKENWERDER (DE) -TRANSFER TO- FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA AG & CO. KG#TRIFTWEG 21-26#16547 BIRKENWERDER (DE)

2003-08-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030515

2003-03-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-11-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021028

2002-09-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59902325 20020919

2002-09-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ROTTMANN, ZIMMERMANN + PARTNER AG

2002-08-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-08-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2002-08-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-07-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA AG & CO. KG

2002-03-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020123

2001-11-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-09-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010714

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI