Global Patent Index - EP 0978393 A1

EP 0978393 A1 2000-02-09 - Method and means for storing the connecting portion of a comb-like binder for a stack of sheets

Title (en)

Method and means for storing the connecting portion of a comb-like binder for a stack of sheets

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Verlagern der Schliessnaht einer einen Blätterpack zusammenhaltenden Drahtkammbindung

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour enfermer l'entretoise d'un peigne de brochage pour relier un cahier

Publication

EP 0978393 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99114493 A

Priority

DE 19835313 A

Abstract (en)

The closing thread displacing process is achieved by means of a friction belt device (28) which turns the wire comb (8) during a feed movement of the sheet pack (1), running at twice the speed of the pull-out roller pair (18, 19). Even relatively thick leaf packs with relatively thin closing sheets can be bound in this way, with the wire comb turning the thread reliably to its destined position.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft die Plazierung der Schließnaht einer blockförmige Erzeugnisse der papierverarbeitenden Industrie zusammenhaltenden Drahtkammbindung. Es ist das Ziel, die Schließnaht an der Unterseite eines Blätterpacks zwischen einer normalen Blockseite und einem verstärkten Bodenblatt zu verstecken. Erreicht wird dies durch eine den Drahtkamm (8) während einer Vorschubbewegung des Blätterpacks (1) verdrehende Reibbandanordnung (28), die mit doppelter Geschwindigkeit umläuft wie ein Abzugsrollenpaar (18, 19). Auf diese Weise wird auch bei der Bindung relativ dicker Blätterpacks unter Verwendung relativ dünner Abschlußblätter der Drahtkamm sicher bis zur vorbestimmten Lage der Schließnaht verdreht. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B42B 5/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B42B 5/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B42B 5/103 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0978393 A1 20000209; DE 19835313 A1 20000210

INPADOC legal status


2002-09-26 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-08-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020201

2000-10-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-05-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KUGLER-WOMAKO GMBH

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI