Global patent index - EP 0978394 A1

EP 0978394 A1 2000-02-09 - Arrangement of a moistening device for the gummed surface of the envelope flap

Title (en)

Arrangement of a moistening device for the gummed surface of the envelope flap

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Befeuchten der Leimkante von Umschlagklappen von Briefumschlägen

Title (fr)

Dispositif de mouillage de la zone adhésive du rabat d'enveloppes

Publication

EP 0978394 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99250236 A

Priority

DE 19836236 A

Abstract (en)

The automated handling of envelopes in a postal system is carried out using a machine in which the envelopes (1) are fed along a track and past a stage (23) where the flap is opened (11) . At this point the adhesive strip of the envelope is contacted by an element (234) that applies moisture. The moisture is produced by a pump (25) coupled to a reservoir.

Abstract (de)

Vorrichtung zum Befeuchten der Leimkante von Umschlagklappen von Briefumschlägen, mit der der Briefumschlag verschlossen wird. Eine derartige Vorrichtung ist optionaler Bestandteil einer Briefvereinzelungsvorrichtung. Zweck ist eine Vergrößerung des Einsatzbereiches. Aufgabengemäß sollen die Briefumschläge auf einer Kante stehend befördert werden und die Befeuchtungskapazität auch für große Transportgeschwindigkeiten ausreichen. Erfindungsgemäß stehen die Briefumschläge 1 auf der Umschlagkante der nach oben gerichteten Umschlagklappe 11 und in der Bewegungsbahn des Briefumschlages 1 und der Umschlagklappe 11 ist eine Führungseinheit 23 für letztere federnd verstellbar angeordnet, die ausgangsseitig Mittel 234 zur Befeuchtung der Leimkante aufweist. Die Führungseinheit besteht im wesentlichen aus einem Schwert 231, einer Leitplatte 232 und einem Feuchtigkeitsspeicher 234, der von oben durch einen Zuführungsschlauch 251 gespeist wird, der wiederum über eine Pumpe 25 mit einem Flüssigkeitstank 24 verbunden ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B43M 5/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B43M 5/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B43M 5/042 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0978394 A1 20000209; DE 19836236 A1 20000210

INPADOC legal status

2003-07-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030102

2002-07-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA AG & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-10-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-04-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000302

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-02-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI