Global patent index - EP 0978438 A1

EP 0978438 A1 2000-02-09 - Fork lift truck

Title (en)

Fork lift truck

Title (de)

Gabelhubwagen

Title (fr)

Chariot élévateur à fourche

Publication

EP 0978438 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98114686 A

Priority

EP 98114686 A

Abstract (en)

The two guide rods (12,15) are of different length so that the load part (3) undergoes a change of incline during rising and lowering. The difference in length is such that the upper end of the gap (22) during the lift movement does not open wide enough to cause risk of injury through misadventure. The back wall of the drive part and front wall of the load part defining the gap are smooth

Abstract (de)

Der Gabelhubwagen 1 weist einen Antriebsteil 2 und einen anhebbaren Lastteil 3 auf, die durch einen längeren oberen Lenker 12 und einen kürzeren unteren Lenker 15 miteinander verbunden sind, so daß der Lastteil 3 beim Anheben und beim Absenken eine kleine Neigungsänderung erfährt. Dabei ist die Ausbildung und Anordnung so gewählt, daß der zwischen der Rückwand 19 des Antriebsteils 2 und der Frontwand 21 des Lastteils 3 gebildete Spalt 22, der sich beim Anheben und beim Absenken des Lastteils 3 öffnet und schließt, im Bereich der Oberkante 20 der Rückwand 19 des Antriebsteils 2 im wesentlichen nicht verändert. Da der Spalt 22 hier nur wenige mm beträgt oder nahezu geschlossen ist, besteht keine Gefahr, daß es durch unachtsames Hineingreifen zu Fingerverletzungen kommt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B62B 3/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B62B 3/065 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B62B 3/0618 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 4209860 A1 19930930 - LINDE AG [DE]

Citation (search report)

[X] US 2615677 A 19521028 - QUAYLE GEORGE F

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB LU NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0978438 A1 20000209; EP 0978438 B1 20040317; DE 59811005 D1 20040422

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160822

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160819

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-09-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160819

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-11-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150819

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150626

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-04-30 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: CROWN GABELSTAPLER GMBH & CO. KG, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59811005

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140326

2014-04-30 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59811005

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: LEONHARD & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20120418

2014-04-30 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59811005

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: LEONHARD & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20140326

2014-03-28 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Ref Legal Event Code: CA

- Effective date: 20140227

2014-03-26 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59811005

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: LEONHARD & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE, DE

2012-04-18 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59811005

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2012-04-18 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59811005

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: LEONHARD & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE, DE

2007-01-02 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: CROWN GABELSTAPLER GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLT1

2007-01-02 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: CROWN HOLDING GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLT1

2005-07-15 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2005-03-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20041220

2005-02-02 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2004-12-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-08-05 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040805

2004-07-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040706

2004-04-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59811005

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-04-22

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-03-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB LU NL

2004-03-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-12-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021017

2000-10-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: BE DE FR GB LU NL

2000-04-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000216

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB LU NL

2000-02-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI