Global Patent Index - EP 0978453 A1

EP 0978453 A1 2000-02-09 - Device for erecting flat folded carton sleeves

Title (en)

Device for erecting flat folded carton sleeves

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Aufrichten von flach gefalteten Schachtelhülsen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour redresser des manchons en carton pliés à plat

Publication

EP 0978453 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99114266 A

Priority

IT BO980486 A

Abstract (en)

A device for erecting flat folded carton sleeves includes a lever mechanism (10) supporting withdrawing means (20) and oscillating between a position, in which the withdrawing means withdraw a flat folded carton sleeve (2) from a magazine (3) and a position in which an erected sleeve is released to a conveying line (4). A folding mechanism (30) is articulated to said lever mechanism (10) and oscillates, so as to act on said sleeve (2) to erect it, while the sleeve is being transferred, kept by said withdrawing means (20), from the position of withdrawal from the magazine (3) to the release position. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 43/26; B31B 5/76

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B31B 5/76 (2006.01); B65B 43/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 43/265 (2013.01); B31B 2201/28 (2013.01); B31B 2203/003 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR

EPO simple patent family

EP 0978453 A1 20000209; EP 0978453 B1 20040929; DE 69920596 D1 20041104; DE 69920596 T2 20050210; ES 2229595 T3 20050416; IT 1304472 B1 20010319; IT BO980486 A1 20000203

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160727

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160722

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160727

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2005-09-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-06-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2229595 T3

2004-11-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69920596 P 20041104

2004-09-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR

2003-05-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030407

2000-10-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR

2000-09-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000726

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR

2000-02-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI