Global patent index - EP 0978454 A1

EP 0978454 A1 2000-02-09 - Device and method for unfolding foldable crates and method for emptying crates

Title (en)

Device and method for unfolding foldable crates and method for emptying crates

Title (de)

Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Entfalten von faltbaren Kisten und Verfahren zum Entleeren von Kisten

Title (fr)

Dispositif et proçédé pour déplier des caisses pliables et proçédé pour vider des caisses

Publication

EP 0978454 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99202527 A

Priority

NL 1009800 A

Abstract (en)

According to the invention a device for unfolding foldable crates is provided, which crates comprise a bottom with two longitudinal walls and two head walls, which can be placed in a folded position and an unfolded position, the device comprising a frame and means for engaging the crate, means to carry the crate along, means for placing the crate in reversed position and means for bringing the crate in its unfolded position. The invention also relates to a method for unfolding foldable crates with the help of the device according to the invention, and to a method for emptying crates with the help of the device according to the invention. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 43/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 43/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 43/265 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0978454 A1 20000209; NL 1009800 C2 20000208

INPADOC legal status

2002-09-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020313

2001-12-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20011102

2000-12-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SYSTEMATE GROUP B.V.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-10-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: BE DE FR GB IT NL

2000-08-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000621

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL

2000-02-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI