Global Patent Index - EP 0978463 A1

EP 0978463 A1 2000-02-09 - Dispenser for blisters containing small items

Title (en)

Dispenser for blisters containing small items

Title (de)

Spender für kleine Gegenstände enthaltende Blisterverpackungen

Title (fr)

Distributeur pour plaquettes type blisters contenant des petits articles

Publication

EP 0978463 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99401921 A

Priority

FR 9810073 A

Abstract (en)

The dispenser consists of a basically parallelpiped box (2) open at the top for loading a cartridge (4) filled with blister packs (6). The box is also open at the bottom, where it has guides (14) for sliding the blister packs out one by one in a horizontal direction as they drop down from the cartridge. Each pack has a series of transparent blisters (9) each containing a single article (12) which is pushed out through a fragile base layer (8) when required for use.

Abstract (fr)

Le distributeur comporte un boîtier (2), avec une embase inférieure (14) munie d'une ouverture latérale (20) d'accès à l'intérieur. Ce boîtier est adapté à recevoir au moins une cartouche (4, 5) ayant sensiblement les mêmes dimensions en hauteur et en profondeur, chaque cartouche contenant une pluralité de supports (6) superposés pour des vis (12) ou analogues afin de délivrer un à un ces supports à travers l'ouverture latérale. Chaque support (6) est constitué par une plaquette, formée d'une feuille en un matériau facilement frangible et d'un capot de recouvrement de la feuille, ce capot, en matériau plus rigide, étant avantageusement transparent, collé ou autrement appliqué contre la feuille et présentant des alvéoles réservés chacun à une vis ou analogue de caractéristiques déterminées, correspondant à une référence exactement identifiée. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 83/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 83/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 83/0805 (2013.01); Y10S 206/815 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0978463 A1 20000209; CA 2279735 A1 20000205; FR 2782070 A1 20000211; FR 2782070 B1 20001013; US 6158585 A 20001212

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030627

2002-02-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011221

2000-10-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000715

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI