Global Patent Index - EP 0978497 A3

EP 0978497 A3 2000-10-25 - Aerating and/or filtering floor structure

Title (en)

Aerating and/or filtering floor structure

Title (de)

Belüftungs- und/oder Filterboden

Title (fr)

Plancher d'aération et/ou de filtration

Publication

EP 0978497 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99890262 A

Priority

AT 136498 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0978497A2] Aeration and/or filtration surface, especially for composting, comprises openings (4) allowing air to be blown in and liquid to be removed. The surface is formed from known hollow decking elements (1) which contain canals (3) connected to the openings on the upper side of the surface. The canals are connected to an air supply or seeped water remover.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C05F 17/02; B01F 3/06; B09B 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C05F 17/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C05F 17/0258 (2013.01); Y02P 20/145 (2015.11); Y02W 30/43 (2015.05)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0978497 A2 20000209; EP 0978497 A3 20001025

INPADOC legal status


2001-07-25 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20010526

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-07-18 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20010425;LT PAYMENT 20010425;LV PAYMENT 20010425;MK PAYMENT 20010425;RO PAYMENT 20010425;SI PAYMENT 20010425

2001-06-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010425

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI