Global Patent Index - EP 0978536 A1

EP 0978536 A1 2000-02-09 - Polymeric compositions with a high toughness based on vinylaromatic polymers with a predominantly syndiotactic structure

Title (en)

Polymeric compositions with a high toughness based on vinylaromatic polymers with a predominantly syndiotactic structure

Title (de)

Polymerzusammensetzungen mit einer verbesserten Zähigkeit auf Basis von Vinylaromatischen Polymeren mit einer vorherrschenden syndiotaktischen Struktur

Title (fr)

Compositions de polymère avec une haute solidarité basées sur les polymères vinylaromatiques avec une structure syndiotactique en prédominance

Publication

EP 0978536 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99114051 A

Priority

IT MI981844 A

Abstract (en)

Polymeric compositions having a high toughness based on vinylaromatic polymers with a syndiotactic structure which comprise: i) 50-95% by weight of a syndiotactic vinylaromatic polymer; ii) 5-45% by weight, of a polar elastomer containing a monomer having epoxy, anhydride and/or carboxylic functional groups; iii) 0.5-15% by weight of a compatibilizing agent selected from: a) a polyarylenether terminated with at least one OH group; b) a styrene-(butene-co-ethylene)-styrene block copolymer; c) atactic polystyrene terminated with at least one amine, epoxy or hydroxy group; d) syndiotactic polystyrene terminated with at least one amine, hydroxy or epoxy group; iv) 0-1% by weight, preferably 0.001-0.5%, of a compound having general formula: NR1R2R3.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C08L 25/06; C08K 5/09; C08K 5/17; C08L 51/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C08K 5/098 (2006.01); C08K 5/17 (2006.01); C08L 25/06 (2006.01); C08L 33/06 (2006.01); C08L 51/00 (2006.01); C08L 71/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C08K 5/098 (2013.01); C08K 5/17 (2013.01); C08L 25/06 (2013.01); C08L 33/064 (2013.01); C08L 51/00 (2013.01); C08L 71/12 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. C08K 5/098 + C08L 25/06
  2. C08K 5/17 + C08L 25/06
  3. C08L 25/06 + C08L 2666/02

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0978536 A1 20000209; IT 1302000 B1 20000720; IT MI981844 A1 20000207; IT MI981844 D0 19980805

INPADOC legal status


2008-07-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080201

2003-07-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030515

2000-10-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000727

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI