Global Patent Index - EP 0978546 A1

EP 0978546 A1 2000-02-09 - Ink compositions containing an ammonium carboxylate salt

Title (en)

Ink compositions containing an ammonium carboxylate salt

Title (de)

Ammoniumcarboxylatsalz enthaltende Tintenzusammensetzungen

Title (fr)

Compositions d'encres contenant un sel de type carboxylate d'ammonium

Publication

EP 0978546 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98305632 A

Priority

EP 98305632 A

Abstract (en)

Ink compositions are described comprising a combination of an ammonium carboxylate salt or salts and one or more surfactants, preferably non-ionic ethoxylated surfactants, hydroxylated or alkoxylated acetylenic polyethylene oxide surfactants, or anionic phosphate esters. The ink compositions substantially prevent thermally-induced phase separation up to about 60 DEG C and, more preferably, up to about 70 DEG C. The ink compositions also are relatively non-toxic, resist the tendency to decel at high frequency print rates, and furthermore provide superior light fastness, edge acuity, and water fastness when printed on conventional or special media. The described ink compositions are particularly suitable for color ink-jet printing over a wide range of print media.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C09D 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C09D 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C09D 11/38 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] US 5108503 A 19920428 - HINDAGOLLA SURAJ L [US], et al
  • [A] EP 0592774 A2 19940420 - CANON KK [JP]
  • [A] US 5626655 A 19970506 - PAWLOWSKI NORMAN E [US], et al
  • [XA] DATABASE WPI Section Ch Week 8432, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class E21, AN 84-199059, XP002086906
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 097, no. 004 30 April 1997 (1997-04-30)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0978546 A1 20000209; EP 0978546 B1 20040324; DE 69822620 D1 20040429; DE 69822620 T2 20050203

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160801

2017-04-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170201

2017-04-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170331

2017-03-22 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160715

2017-02-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69822620

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150626

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150623

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150625

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150626

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-06-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-04-25 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20120329 AND 20120404

2005-03-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041228

2004-12-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-04-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69822620 P 20040429

2004-03-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-03-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2001-09-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010720

2001-05-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HEWLETT-PACKARD COMPANY, A DELAWARE CORPORATION

2000-10-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2000-07-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000522

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-02-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI