Global Patent Index - EP 0978554 A2

EP 0978554 A2 2000-02-09 - Turbine and R&O oils containing neutral rust inhibitors

Title (en)

Turbine and R&O oils containing neutral rust inhibitors

Title (de)

Neutrale Rostinhibitore enthaltende Turbin- und R&O-Öle

Title (fr)

Huiles de turbine ou R&O comprenant des inhibiteurs de rouille neutre

Publication

EP 0978554 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99305884 A

Priority

GB 9816951 A

Abstract (en)

A composition suitable for use as a turbine or rust and oxidation (R&G) oil comprising a major portion of a base oil and (A) at least one neutral rust inhibitor, wherein the base oil has a viscosity index of greater than 80, a saturates content of greater than 90 wt% and a sulfur content of 0.5 wt% or less providing improved filterability. Further improved hydrolytic stability may be obtained by the addition of (B) a compound of the formula:

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10M 101/02; C10M 169/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10M 139/00 (2006.01); C10M 169/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10M 169/04 (2013.01); C10M 2203/1006 (2013.01); C10M 2203/1025 (2013.01); C10M 2203/1045 (2013.01); C10M 2203/1065 (2013.01); C10M 2203/1085 (2013.01); C10M 2207/282 (2013.01); C10M 2207/285 (2013.01); C10M 2207/286 (2013.01); C10M 2207/287 (2013.01); C10M 2207/288 (2013.01); C10M 2207/289 (2013.01); C10M 2215/08 (2013.01); C10M 2215/082 (2013.01); C10M 2215/086 (2013.01); C10M 2215/12 (2013.01); C10M 2215/122 (2013.01); C10M 2215/224 (2013.01); C10M 2215/28 (2013.01); C10M 2219/044 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

C10M 169/04 + C10M 101/02 + C10M 129/72 + C10M 129/76 + C10M 133/16 + C10M 133/46 + C10M 133/56 + C10M 135/10

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0978554 A2 20000209; EP 0978554 A3 20000308; EP 0978554 B1 20031217; CA 2276920 A1 20000204; CN 1100858 C 20030205; CN 1244571 A 20000216; DE 69913615 D1 20040129; DE 69913615 T2 20041014; GB 9816951 D0 19980930; JP 2000063879 A 20000229; JP 3642556 B2 20050427; KR 20000017030 A 20000325; SG 85123 A1 20011219

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160727

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160727

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160726

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100802

2011-04-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110331

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090717

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-05-26 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2004-12-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040920

2004-08-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-01-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69913615 P 20040129

2003-12-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB

2003-12-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2001-08-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010705

2000-11-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE FR GB

2000-07-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000526

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB

2000-02-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI