Global Patent Index - EP 0978574 A1

EP 0978574 A1 2000-02-09 - Compositions of cationic surfactants and their use as antifouling agents for induced draft fans (IDF)

Title (en)

Compositions of cationic surfactants and their use as antifouling agents for induced draft fans (IDF)

Title (de)

Zusammensetzungen von kationische Tenside und deren Verwendung als verschmutzungsverhindernde Substanzen für Gebläse mit erzwungenen Abzug

Title (fr)

Compositions de surfactifs cationiques et leur utilisation comme agents antisalissures pour ventilateurs à tirage forcé

Publication

EP 0978574 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98830477 A

Priority

EP 98830477 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention relates to a cationic surfactant in the form of one or more quaternary ammonium salts. Additionally, the present invention provides also the formulation of a composition comprising one or more such quaternary ammonium salts and their use as antifouling agents for induced draft fans for extracting burnt gases from steel plant units. The composition according to the invention comprises at least one quaternary ammonium salt having at least one radical selected from alkyl, alkylaryl, or etherocycle, wherein said radical has an alkyl chain with 8 to 18 carbon atoms and is bonded to the nitrogen atom. The active agent is generally present in an amount of 15 to 60% by weight with respect to the total composition. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C23F 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C09K 3/00 (2006.01); C11D 3/02 (2006.01); C21B 7/22 (2006.01); C21C 5/38 (2006.01); C23F 15/00 (2006.01); F23L 17/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C21C 5/38 (2013.01); C23F 15/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0978574 A1 20000209; AU 4236399 A 20000224; CA 2279553 A1 20000204; JP 2000073044 A 20000307; KR 20000016979 A 20000325

INPADOC legal status


2003-08-13 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030616

2003-03-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030204

2000-10-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

2000-05-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000329

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

2000-02-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI