Global patent index - EP 0978581 A3

EP 0978581 A3 2001-04-04 - Textile processing machine with a drawing frame unit

Title (en)

Textile processing machine with a drawing frame unit

Title (de)

Textilverarbeitende Maschine mit einer Streckwerkseinheit

Title (fr)

Machine pour le traitement de matériau textile avec banc d'étirage

Publication

EP 0978581 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99810622 A

Priority

DE 19835372 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0978581A2] The comber assembly (1), with a following two-stage drawing unit (6) to process the combed fibers (8), has a controlled speed for the paired entry rollers (42) at the second drawing stage (II). The roller speed is set through a signal from a monitor (30) for the drawn fibers (12) from the first drawing stage (I). A sliver buffer (3) is between the drawing stages (I,II). The paired outlet rollers (11) at the first drawing stage (I) have a controlled drive (M3), and its paired inlet rollers (10) are coupled to the drive (M1) of the textile machine (1). The drive motor (M1) for the textile machine (1) and the drive motor (M2) for the paired entry rollers (10) of the first drawing stage (I) are controlled by a common frequency converter (20). The transmission for the paired entry rollers (10) of the first drawing stage (I) is linked to the transmission (14) of the textile machine (1). The drawing stages (I,II) have separate drive motors (M3,M5). The machine drive motor (M1) acts as a master for the drive motor (M3) for the paired exit rollers (11) of the first drawing stage (I) and for the drive motor (M5) for the second drawing stage (II). A number of combing heads, at the comber (1), are in front of the drawing stages, with a separate drive motor for their lap rollers, with a speed controlled by the monitor (30) signals. A sliver laying unit (60) is after the drawing unit (6), to lay the drawn sliver (9). The drive (50,51) for the laying system is coupled to the transmission (47) for the paired exit rollers (43) of the second drawing stage (II). Sensors (S1,S2) at the sliver buffer (3) are connected to the control for the drive motor (M5) for the second drawing stage (II), which in turn controls the sliver buffer. The sliver buffer (3) forms a suspended sliver loop (FS), with at least one sensor (S1,S2) to register the loop. A further pair of rollers (40) is between the sliver buffer (3) and the monitor (30), with a drive (27) linked to the drive (38) for the paired entry rollers (42) at the second drawing stage (II). A monitor (57) for the drawn sliver (9) is between the second drawing stage (II) and the sliver laying unit (60). The sliver laying unit (60) has a separate electric drive motor, controlled by the drive motor (M5) for the second drawing stage (II), through a frequency converter.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01G 21/00; D01G 23/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01G 19/08 (2006.01); D01G 21/00 (2006.01); D01G 23/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01G 19/08 (2013.01); D01G 21/00 (2013.01); D01G 23/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0978581 A2 20000209; EP 0978581 A3 20010404; EP 0978581 B1 20040121; CN 1168863 C 20040929; CN 1243893 A 20000209; DE 19835372 A1 20000210

INPADOC legal status

2016-04-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150712

2016-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160202

2016-02-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59908347

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140729

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140721

- Year of fee payment: 16

2007-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2006-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060731

2006-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060731

2005-07-14 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050714

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-01-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20041022

2004-02-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59908347

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-02-26

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-01-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2004-01-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE IT LI

2001-11-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20011003

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7D 01G 21/00 A, 7D 01G 23/06 B

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI

2000-02-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI