Global Patent Index - EP 0978587 A3

EP 0978587 A3 2000-11-22 - Process for setting a uniform transverse profile for a paper web

Title (en)

Process for setting a uniform transverse profile for a paper web

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Einstellung eines gleichmässigen Eigenschaftsquerprofils einer Papierbahn

Title (fr)

Procédé pour ajuster le profil transversal uniform d'une bande de papier

Publication

EP 0978587 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99108743 A

Priority

DE 19835295 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0978587A2] To set a consistent characteristic lateral profile in a paper web, the weight cross section profile is measured and adjusted by setting the sectional pulp density at the stock inlet. The lateral formation profile is then set by amending the specific pulp throughput at the delivery jet of the stock inlet. Simultaneously or subsequently, the dimensions of the delivery jet are increased or decreased at points where there is a raised pulp throughput. The change in the delivery jet is proportional to the change in the specific pulp throughput and, after setting, the flow is at the required lateral speed profile. At least one of the setting steps is effected by a control circuit. Additional chemicals are added pref. at the edge zone, to delay and/or increase the water extraction rate from the pulp. The variations in the specific pulp suspension flows are through sectional extraction or addition of a fluid in the Z-direction, together with filling materials where there are zones with a higher throughput. The technique is especially for a paper making machine with a double fourdrinier.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 1/08; D21F 1/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 1/06 (2006.01); D21F 1/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 1/08 (2013.01); D21F 1/06 (2013.01); Y10S 162/10 (2013.01); Y10S 162/11 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] DE 4239845 A1 19930519 - VOITH GMBH J M [DE]
  • [A] HEINZMANN H: "FASERORIENTIERUNGS-QUERPROFIL", WOCHENBLATT FUER PAPIERFABRIKATION,DE,BIBERBACH, vol. 123, no. 4, February 1995 (1995-02-01), pages 121 - 126, XP000852516

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0978587 A2 20000209; EP 0978587 A3 20001122; EP 0978587 B1 20030423; AT 238449 T 20030515; DE 19835295 A1 20000210; US 6203665 B1 20010320

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111130

2013-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110504

2012-02-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110503

2012-02-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 238449 T

- Effective date: 20110503

2012-01-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110503

2012-01-10 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2011-11-30 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59905149

2010-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20100517

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20100513

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100521

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-07-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20100514

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-04-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040126

2003-08-12 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-05-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59905149 P 20030528

2003-04-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI SE

2001-08-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE FI SE

2001-07-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010522

2000-12-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI SE

2000-02-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI