Global Patent Index - EP 0978592 A1

EP 0978592 A1 2000-02-09 - Loader and vehicle with a loader

Title (en)

Loader and vehicle with a loader

Title (de)

Lader und Fahrzeug mit einem Lader

Title (fr)

Chargeur et véhicule comprenant un chargeur

Publication

EP 0978592 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99114042 A

Priority

DE 19834773 A

Abstract (en)

A loader with at least one loading arm (18), a parking support (24) and a strut (32) is described. The parking support is mounted to be able to pivot about a first pivot axis (37) and the strut about a second pivot axis a distance in front of the first one, both axes being on the loader arm. The loader has safety devices (56) for detachable securing of the parking support against pivoting with respect to the loader arm in a transport position. The strut has a support part (58) which can support itself in a park position on the parking support with the safety devices released. The parking support has a stop (46) on which the strut lies at least in the transport position and which is located between the strut and the loader arm.

Abstract (de)

Es wird ein Lader (10) mit mindestens einem Laderarm (18), einer Abstellstütze (28) und einer Strebe (32) vorgeschlagen, wobei die Abstellstütze (28) um eine erste Schwenkachse (37) und die Strebe (32) um eine zweite, von der ersten Schwenkachse (37) beabstandete Schwenkachse (55) verschwenkbar an dem Laderarm (18) angebracht ist, sowie mit Sicherungsmitteln (56) zum lösbaren Sichern der Abstellstütze (28) gegen ein Verschwenken gegenüber dem Laderarm (18) in einer Transportstellung, wobei die Strebe (32) einen Stützteil (58) aufweist, der sich bei gelösten Sicherungsmitteln (56) in einer Parkstellung auf der Abstellstütze (28) abstützen kann. Die Abstellstütze (28) weist einen Anschlag (46) auf, an dem die Strebe (32) zumindest in der Transportstellung anliegt, wobei der Anschlag (46) zwischen der Strebe (32) und dem Laderarm (18) angeordnet ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E02F 3/627

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E02F 3/627 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E02F 3/6273 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19834773 A1 20000203; AT 329093 T 20060615; CA 2279169 A1 20000201; CA 2279169 C 20041214; DE 59913505 D1 20060720; EP 0978592 A1 20000209; EP 0978592 B1 20060607; ES 2262275 T3 20061116; US 6247888 B1 20010619

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150721

2017-03-03 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20170303

2016-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150731

2016-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150721

2016-05-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150720

2016-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160202

2016-04-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150720

2016-04-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160331

2016-03-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150720

2016-03-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 329093 T

- Effective date: 20150720

2016-03-01 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2016-02-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59913505

2014-11-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20140702

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-11-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20140729

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-11-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140729

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-11-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20140728

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140717

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140619

- Year of fee payment: 16

2007-05-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070308

2006-12-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2262275 T3

2006-09-05 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2006-08-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060724

2006-07-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59913505 P 20060720

2006-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB SE

2006-06-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-05-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050408

2000-10-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE ES FR GB SE

2000-09-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000712

2000-04-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GUIET, LIONEL

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB SE

2000-02-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI