Global Patent Index - EP 0978595 A3

EP 0978595 A3 2001-05-02 - Pipe for sanitary fittings

Title (en)

Pipe for sanitary fittings

Title (de)

Rohr für ein Sanitärelement

Title (fr)

Tuyau pour articles sanitaires

Publication

EP 0978595 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99113366 A

Priority

  • DE 19835793 A
  • DE 19916432 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0978595A2] The pipe for a lavatory installation, and especially a curved pipe section, has a socket (4) to hold the end of a pipe or a pipe connection. At least two radially projecting ribs (12) are at the outer surface of the pipe (2) and/or at least one groove (14,15), especially axially between the ribs (12). They hold a pipe clip (13) or rings or projections (16) at the pipe clip (13) or a mounting plate and the like.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03C 1/122; E03D 11/13; F16L 21/03; F16L 37/02; F16L 47/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E03C 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E03C 1/021 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0978595 A2 20000209; EP 0978595 A3 20010502; PL 334796 A1 20000214

INPADOC legal status


2005-08-10 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050201

2005-01-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041118

2002-01-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-07-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010523

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI