Global Patent Index - EP 0978596 A1

EP 0978596 A1 2000-02-09 - Air extraction system for toilets

Title (en)

Air extraction system for toilets

Title (de)

Luftabsaugungssystem für Toiletten

Title (fr)

Système d'extraction d'air pour toilettes

Publication

EP 0978596 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99500137 A

Priority

ES 9801675 A

Abstract (en)

An air extraction system for toilets that comprises an extractor fan (3) connected by means of some tubes (1,6,10a) to a water discharge pipe, in such a way that it takes advantage of the internal cavities of the toilet (4) to extract air from inside it, expelling the air to the part behind the siphon or to the outside. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03D 9/052

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E03D 9/05 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E03D 9/05 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0978596 A1 20000209; ES 2151833 A1 20010101; ES 2151833 B1 20010701

INPADOC legal status


2003-05-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020907

2002-06-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020426

2000-10-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000224

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI