Global Patent Index - EP 0978598 A2

EP 0978598 A2 2000-02-09 - Fixing device for a flushing cistern

Title (en)

Fixing device for a flushing cistern

Title (de)

Befestigungsanordnung eines Spülkastens

Title (fr)

Dispositif de fixation d'une chasse d'eau

Publication

EP 0978598 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99113412 A

Priority

  • DE 19835789 A
  • DE 19836634 A

Abstract (en)

The system to install a water cistern (2), on to profiled mounting rails, has a holder (36) at each mounting point (14). On inserting the cistern (2) between the rails, the holders expand without affecting the insertion movements of the cistern (2) along the rails. The holders (36) engage in longitudinal grooves, cut back into the profiled rails, or the edge of a mounting plate, with a claw grip which is locked in place by tightening a screw.

Abstract (de)

Eine Befestigungsanordnung eines Spülkastens (2) enthält zwei im wesentlichen parallel zueinander und vorzugsweise vertikal ausgerichtete Profilschienen (4, 5), zwischen welche der Spülkasten (2) einsetzbar ist und mit welchen der Spülkasten (2) mittels Befestigungsmitteln (14) verbindbar ist. Eine derartige Befestigungsanordnung soll dahingehend weitergebildet werden, daß bei einfacher Handhabung die Montage schnell durchführbar ist und gleichwohl eine stabile Befestigung des Spülkastens gewährleistet wird. Zur Lösung wird vorgeschlagen, daß die Befestigungsmittel (14) ein Halteelement (36) aufweisen, welches derart angeordnet ist und/oder beim Einsetzen des Spülkastens (2) zwischen die Profilschienen (4, 5) derart ausweicht, daß es ohne Beeinträchtigung der Einsetzbewegung des Spülkastens (2) an der Profilschiene (4, 5) vorbeibewegbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03D 11/14; F16B 7/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E03D 11/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E03D 11/146 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 8508107 U1 19850502

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0978598 A2 20000209; EP 0978598 A3 20010321; PL 334794 A1 20000214

INPADOC legal status


2004-06-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031216

2003-07-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030603

2001-12-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010329

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI