Global patent index - EP 0978599 A1

EP 0978599 A1 2000-02-09 - Sewage disposal process at low depth working with a single vacuum source

Title (en)

Sewage disposal process at low depth working with a single vacuum source

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Abwasserentsorgung bei geringer Tiefe welches mit einer einzigen Ansaugstation arbeitet

Title (fr)

Procédé d'assainissement à faible profondeur fonctionnant avec un poste unique d'aspiration

Publication

EP 0978599 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99460051 A

Priority

FR 9810268 A

Abstract (en)

The drainage system consists of a network of gravity feed pipes (30 - 35) which follow the natural slope of the land and carry the water to a series of manholes (20 - 23) situated at low points and of sufficient volume to store the water for a set period. The water is drawn from the manholes through suction pipes (4) to a single pumping station (1) via a management system with valves (8) emptying each manhole in turn.

Abstract (fr)

Procédé d'assainissement à faible profondeur fonctionnant avec un poste unique d'aspiration refoulement.Ce dispositif trouve son application dans le transfert des eaux d'assainissement. L'invention constitue un procédé de réalisation d'un réseau d'assainissement à faible profondeur dans lequel les réseaux gravitaires (30) (31) (32) (33) (34) (35) suivent la pente naturelle du terrain et rassemblent les eaux dans des regards (20) (21) (22) (23), situés aux points bas. De chaque regard (20) (21) (22) (23) part une canalisation d'aspiration (4) reliée à une station de pompage unique (1) où une télégestion gère la mise en aspiration successive des différents regards de collecte (20) (21) (22) (23) . Grâce à l'invention, on peut poser les réseaux gravitaires à faible profondeur. La multiplication des points bas n'engendrant pas la multiplication des postes de refoulement. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03F 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E03F 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E03F 1/007 (2013.01); E03F 1/006 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0978599 A1 20000209; FR 2782101 A1 20000211; FR 2782101 B1 20001103

INPADOC legal status

2004-02-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030806

2001-07-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010612

2000-10-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000801

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI