Global Patent Index - EP 0978600 A3

EP 0978600 A3 2001-01-17 - Sound insulating device

Title (en)

Sound insulating device

Title (de)

Schalldämpfungsmittel

Title (fr)

Dispositif atténuateur de bruits

Publication

EP 0978600 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99115547 A

Priority

  • DE 19835798 A
  • DE 19901607 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0978600A2] A sound damping agent comprises at least one layer of film material (20) which is tensioned by springs.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 1/84; E04B 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/82 (2006.01); E04B 1/84 (2006.01); E04B 2/74 (2006.01); E04H 15/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 2/7409 (2013.01); E04B 1/82 (2013.01); E04B 1/8409 (2013.01); E04H 15/28 (2013.01); E04B 2001/8263 (2013.01); E04B 2001/8452 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0978600 A2 20000209; EP 0978600 A3 20010117

INPADOC legal status


2003-09-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030301

2001-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010707

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 04B 1/84 A, 7E 04B 1/00 B

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI