Global Patent Index - EP 0978603 A1

EP 0978603 A1 2000-02-09 - Multi-part clip for façades

Title (en)

Multi-part clip for façades

Title (de)

Mehrteilige Fassadenklammer

Title (fr)

Attache en plusieurs parties pour façades

Publication

EP 0978603 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99113480 A

Priority

DE 29814097 U

Abstract (en)

The facade clamp (10) is made of metal and comprises a base plate (11) and two initial clamps (12, 13), which are for suspension in the base plate (11). In the facade clamp a facade plate can be suspended. The base plate has two large, rectangular breakthroughs (16), above which are arranged two narrow rectangular slots (17). The breakthroughs and the slots are matched to the width of the initial clamps. In the areas of the breakthroughs and slots, the base plate is provided with bends (18), which provide for a free space (19), which with regard to its dimensions corresponds to those of the initial clamps. The initial clamps are so formed that in the fitted state they are arranged with their area (20) within the free space (19). Hook components (24) are inserted through openings on the narrow side of the facade plate.

Abstract (de)

Es ist eine mehrteilige Fassadenklammer (82; 87) zum Einhängen einer Fassadenplatte (80; 85, 86) beschrieben, die mit einer auf einer Unterkonstruktion befestigbaren Grundplatte und mit mindestens einer Anfangs- oder Fugenklammer versehen ist, die unter einem Formschluß lösbar an der Grundplatte befestigbar ist, und die ein Hakenelement aufweist. Das Hakenelement ist in eine an einer Schmalseite der Fassadenplatte (80; 85, 86) vorgesehene, dem Hakenelement zugeordnete Öffnung (83; 88) einführbar. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04F 13/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04F 13/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04F 13/0825 (2013.01); E04F 13/0821 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 19617269 A1 19971113 - BWM DUEBEL & MONTAGETECH [DE]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 29814097 U1 19981126; EP 0978603 A1 20000209

INPADOC legal status


2004-03-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030916

2003-04-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030303

2000-10-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE FR IT LI NL

2000-05-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000323

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI NL

2000-02-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI