Global Patent Index - EP 0978610 A1

EP 0978610 A1 2000-02-09 - Improved electric lock for a motor vehicle wing

Title (en)

Improved electric lock for a motor vehicle wing

Title (de)

Verbessertes elektrisches Schloss für einen Kraftfahrzeugflügel

Title (fr)

Serrure électrique perfectionnée pour ouvrant de véhicule automobile

Publication

EP 0978610 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99401967 A

Priority

FR 9810057 A

Abstract (en)

The lock case (125) contains a motor and gear train driving a wheel having on one face two diametrically opposed pegs. Each peg as it revolves enters and leaves a notch (134) in a drive lever (132) on a common pivot (137) with and pinned (144) to the lock catch (131). While engaged, the peg rotates the lever (F3), compressing a return spring (143). In the closed position (motor deenergised), the lock bolt (130), on a separate pivot (139), retaining the hasp bar in its notch (138), is secured by the catch (131a,136), which with the lever is pushed towards it by the spring. The bolt's curved face (135) rests on the lever shank (132c), while the lever's sprung (140) toe (140a) rides on its concave face (142). The peg's opening action draws the catch clear (d) of the bolt. The lever's resilient toe (140a) mean-time has ridden up the bolt face (142) and hooked over the vertex (141); however, in normal circumstances, reaction forces exerted by the compressed door seal, via the hasp bar, on the bolt notch (138) rotate the bolt, allowing the bar to escape, so releasing the door. If these forces should be insufficient, the second drive-wheel peg, arriving on the outer face (132a) of the lever, press through the toe on the bolt, keeping it in the closed position until, e.g. the user adds his efforts; meantime the motor remains stalled.

Abstract (fr)

Serrure électrique comportant un entraîneur (132) solidaire d'un cliquet (131) et comportant un évidement (134) en V, un moteur électrique (9) destiné à entraîner un maneton (28,29) apte à pénétrer dans ledit évidement (134) jusqu'à ce que l'entraîneur (132) échappe à l'action du maneton (28,29), un moyen de blocage (140,141) apte à prendre une position de blocage du cliquet (131) en fin de pivotement du cliquet (131) vers sa position écartée, et à prendre une position de déblocage du cliquet (131), de préférence au plus tard en fin de course de rotation du pêne (130) vers sa position d'ouverture, caractérisée par le fait que le moyen de blocage (140,141) comporte un organe d'accrochage déplaçable (140) à rappel élastique et une saillie de retenue conjuguée (141) portés l'un par l'entraîneur (132) et l'autre par le pêne (130), ledit organe (140) étant apte à franchir puis s'accrocher en aval sur ladite saillie (141) en fin de pivotement du cliquet (131), le cliquet (131) étant ainsi bloqué en position écartée jusqu'à ce que le pêne (130) commence à pivoter vers sa position d'ouverture. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 47/00; E05B 65/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 65/12 (2006.01); E05B 65/32 (2006.01); E05B 65/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 81/14 (2013.01); E05B 85/26 (2013.01); E05B 81/15 (2013.01); Y10S 292/43 (2013.01); Y10T 292/1047 (2015.04); Y10T 292/1082 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0978610 A1 20000209; EP 0978610 B1 20030521; DE 69908037 D1 20030626; DE 69908037 T2 20040401; ES 2200483 T3 20040301; FR 2782111 A1 20000211; FR 2782111 B1 20021206; US 6109671 A 20000829

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170817

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160802

2017-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160802

2017-04-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160802

2016-05-05 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: U-SHIN FRANCE SAS

- Effective date: 20160428

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150813

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150826

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150813

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-06-25 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: U-SHIN FRANCE SAS, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: VALEO SECURITE HABITACLE, CRETEIL, FR

- Document: DE 69908037

- Effective date: 20150515

2015-06-25 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69908037

- Representative's name: PRINZ & PARTNER MBB PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSANWAE, DE

- Effective date: 20150515

2015-05-15 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69908037

- Representative's name: PRINZ & PARTNER MBB PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSANWAE, DE

2005-03-29 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2004-08-03 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040803

2004-05-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040224

2004-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2200483 T3

2003-09-02 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-07-18 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20030718

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-06-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69908037 P 20030626

2003-06-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030521

2003-05-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT SE

2003-05-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-06-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010511

2000-10-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES GB IT SE

2000-04-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000222

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT SE

2000-02-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI