Global Patent Index - EP 0978613 B1

EP 0978613 B1 2001-03-21 - Anti-panic bar

Title (en)

Anti-panic bar

Title (de)

Antipanikstange

Title (fr)

Barre anti-panique

Publication

EP 0978613 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99113712 A

Priority

ES 9801713 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0978613A1] The anti-panic bar, fitted to emergency exit doors, has a push bar which is mounted at the door by rotating holding arms (3) with shafts (4) in holders (5). The shafts (4) have a radial pin (6), with a rotating movement path between start and end positions, where the rest position is the lowest setting of the push bar. In the rest position, the pin (6) faces the neighboring end of a locking pawl (7) on a sliding plate (9), which can slide across the shaft (4) to a position where the pin (6) at the lowest setting is under the holding edge of the locking pawl (7). The sliding plate (9) has a second locking pawl (10), symmetrical to the first pawl (7), which allows the mechanism to be reversed. The sliding plate (9) has a push knob and a ratchet mechanism (12,13,15) to secure each locking position of the sliding plate.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 65/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 65/10 (2006.01); E05B 17/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 65/1066 (2013.01); E05B 65/108 (2013.01); E05B 17/22 (2013.01); E05B 65/1093 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0978613 A1 20000209; EP 0978613 B1 20010321; DE 59900059 D1 20010426; ES 2157145 A1 20010801; ES 2157145 B1 20020101; PT 978613 E 20010830

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160701

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160613

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-06-13 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120713

2011-12-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110726

- Year of fee payment: 13

2007-03-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20060713

2007-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070201

2006-07-13 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060713

2005-05-27 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050527

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-05-24 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050524

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-03-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-07-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-04-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59900059

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-04-26

2001-04-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20010321

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT PT

2000-11-16 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ST. TECN. INGG. SIMONI - DE BLASIO

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-10-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT PT

2000-08-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000717

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000428

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT PT

2000-02-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI