Global Patent Index - EP 0978618 A2

EP 0978618 A2 2000-02-09 - Window or door

Title (en)

Window or door

Title (de)

Fenster oder Tür

Title (fr)

Fenêtre ou porte

Publication

EP 0978618 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99115395 A

Priority

DE 19835568 A

Abstract (en)

The window or door, within a rectangular frame, has a leading rebate. The inserted panel has a rectangular wood frame with horizontal and vertical panel friezes (20,22). The vertical friezes (22) pass through, and their leading sides are on a common plane (24). The vertical friezes (22) are at the outer edges and at the ends behind the leading rebate (18) of the frame, and are raised into a plane (26) set back from the plane (24) of the leading sides of the vertical friezes (22). The leading sides of the horizontal panel friezes (20) are on a common plane (28) set back from the plane (26) of the panel raising cut.

Abstract (de)

Ein Fenster oder eine Tür hat einem rechteckigen Blendrahmen aus Holz mit einer Vorfälzung und wenigstens einen in den Blendrahmen passenden Flügel. Der Flügel hat einen rechteckigen Flügelrahmen aus Holz mit horizontalen und vertikalen Flügelfriesen (20, 22), die vorne eben und nach innen stark gerundet sind. Die vertikalen Flügelfriese (22) gehen durch. Die Vorderseiten der vertikalen Flügelfriese (22) liegen in einer gemeinsamen Ebene (24). Die vertikalen Flügelfriese (22) sind am Außenrand und an den Enden hinter der Vorfälzung (18) des Blendrahmens in einer Ebene (26) abgeplattet, die bezüglich der Ebene (24) der Vorderseiten der vertikalen Flügelfriese (22) rückversetzt ist. Die Vorderseiten der horizontalen Flügelfriese (20) liegen in einer gemeinsamen Ebene (28), die bezüglich der Ebene (26) der Abplattung rückversetzt ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 3/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/10 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0978618 A2 20000209; EP 0978618 A3 20010516

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040302

2002-02-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011115

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI