Global Patent Index - EP 0978619 A2

EP 0978619 A2 2000-02-09 - Insulating strip

Title (en)

Insulating strip

Title (de)

Dämmleiste

Title (fr)

Profilé isolant

Publication

EP 0978619 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99115054 A

Priority

DE 19835439 A

Abstract (en)

A plastic insulating slat for a laminar profile comprises a frame structure (4,6), a connection profile (12) which enables the slat to be anchored in a metal profile holding contour, and at least one thin walled frame area where the wall is 0.3-1.2 mm thick. Additional heat insulating material is connected to parts of the frame.

Abstract (de)

Eine Dämmleiste (2) aus Kunststoff für ein Verbundprofil weist eine dünnwandige Rahmenstruktur (7) auf. Wärmedämmendes Material (14) steht mit mindestens einem Teil der Rahmenstruktur (7) in Verbindung. Ferner sind Anschlußprofile (12) vorgesehen, über die die Dämmleiste in einer Haltekontur eines Metallprofils verankerbar ist. Mindestens ein Bereich der Rahmenstruktur ist dünnwandig, wobei eine Wandstärke des dünnwandigen Bereichs in einen Bereich zwischen 0,3 mm und 1,2 mm liegt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 3/263

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/263 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/2632 (2013.01); E06B 2003/26329 (2013.01); E06B 2003/2633 (2013.01); E06B 2003/26332 (2013.01); E06B 2003/26354 (2013.01); E06B 2003/26359 (2013.01); E06B 2003/26361 (2013.01); E06B 2003/26374 (2013.01); E06B 2003/26378 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0978619 A2 20000209; EP 0978619 A3 20000920; EP 0978619 B1 20030618; EP 0978619 B9 20040811; EP 0978619 B9 20041006; AT 243294 T 20030715; AT 483887 T 20101015; DE 19835439 A1 20000217; DE 59905978 D1 20030724; DE 59915206 D1 20101118; EP 1318262 A1 20030611; EP 1318262 B1 20101006

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170816

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-08-14 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: TECHNOFORM BAUTEC HOLDING GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SCHULZ, HARALD, DR.-ING., 86381 KRUMBACH, DE

- Document: DE 59905978

- Effective date: 20130624

2013-08-14 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59905978

- Representative's name: KRAMER - BARSKE - SCHMIDTCHEN, DE

- Effective date: 20130624

2013-08-14 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59905978

- Representative's name: KRAMER BARSKE SCHMIDTCHEN PATENTANWAELTE PARTG, DE

- Effective date: 20130624

2013-06-24 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59905978

- Representative's name: KRAMER - BARSKE - SCHMIDTCHEN, DE

2010-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090804

2010-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090831

2010-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090831

2010-03-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-11-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20080814

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20080710

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SCHULZ HARALD

- Effective date: 20050831

2007-10-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: SCHULZ, HARALD, DR.-ING.

- Free text: SCHULZ, HARALD, DR.-ING.#HUERBENERSTRASSE 6#86381 KRUMBACH (DE) -TRANSFER TO- SCHULZ, HARALD, DR.-ING.#HUERBENERSTRASSE 6#86381 KRUMBACH (DE)

2006-05-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060428

2006-04-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060428

2006-04-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050804

2005-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050831

2005-08-04 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050804

2005-08-04 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050804

2005-03-29 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2004-08-20 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040820

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-08-06 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20040806

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-08-06 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040806

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-08-05 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040805

2004-06-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040319

2004-04-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-01-28 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2003-12-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-11-06 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20031106

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-11-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031014

2003-09-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: DR. LUSUARDI AG

2003-09-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030929

2003-09-18 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030918

2003-09-18 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030918

2003-09-18 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030918

2003-09-09 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-08-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030831

2003-08-04 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030804

2003-08-04 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030804

2003-07-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59905978 P 20030724

2003-07-23 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-06-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-06-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-06-18 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030618

2003-06-18 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030618

2003-06-18 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030618

2001-08-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010628

2001-08-08 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-06-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE IT LI NL SE

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010214

2000-11-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHULZ, HARALD, DR.-ING.

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI