Global Patent Index - EP 0978626 A1

EP 0978626 A1 2000-02-09 - Method of constructing a tunnel lined with a tubing element

Title (en)

Method of constructing a tunnel lined with a tubing element

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Herstellen eines mit einer Verkleidung aus Rohrelementen bestehenden Tunnels

Title (fr)

Procédé de construction d'un tunnel avec un revêtement à voussoirs

Publication

EP 0978626 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99201901 A

Priority

BE 9800584 A

Abstract (en)

An articulated drilling tool (7) and a draw cable (6) is brought from ditch (3) to ditch and the tunnel opening (9) to be lined is formed in the ground (2) between the ditches. In one ditch a rotating tunnel boring machine (12) is fixed to the draw cable and with the aid of a tractive machine (20) in another ditch the tunnel boring machine is drawn from the first to the second ditch. At least three ditches are made and the draw cable is fed from one ditch over a second to a third. The ditch in which the tractive machine (20) is located, at least on the sides where a tunnel (1) is to be formed, is clad with a wall (4), which is interrupted at the position of the mouth of the tunnel and on it the tractive machine during drawing is supported.

Abstract (de)

Verfahren zum Konstruieren eines unterirdischen Tunnels mit einer Verkleidung, wobei eine Tunnelöffnung (9) im Boden (2) gemacht wird und in dem Maß, wie diese Tunnelöffnung (9) geformt wird, Rohrelemente (11) eines nach dem anderen als Ganzes oder in Teilen vor Ort angebracht werden, dadurch gekennzeichnet, daß zuerst mindestens zwei Gruben (3) im Boden (2) gemacht werden, mit einem gelenkten Bohrwerkzeug (7) ein Zugkabel (6) oder dergleichen von Grube (3) zu Grube (3) angebracht wird und die zu verkleidende Tunnelöffnung (9) im Boden (2) zwischen diesen Gruben (3) geformt wird, indem in einer Grube (3) eine rotierende Tunnelbohrmaschine (12) an dem Zugkabel (6) befestigt wird und mit Hilfe einer Zugmaschine (20) in einer anderen Grube (3) die Tunnelbohrmaschine (12) von der ersten zur anderen Grube (3) gezogen wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21B 7/28; E21D 9/08; E21D 9/10; E21D 11/15

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21B 7/04 (2006.01); E21B 7/28 (2006.01); E21D 9/087 (2006.01); E21D 9/10 (2006.01); E21D 11/15 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21D 9/102 (2013.01); E21B 7/046 (2013.01); E21B 7/28 (2013.01); E21D 11/15 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE FR GB LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0978626 A1 20000209; EP 0978626 B1 20050119; BE 1013003 A3 20010703; DE 59911467 D1 20050224

INPADOC legal status


2009-05-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090101

2009-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080630

2009-03-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090101

2008-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: BEHEERSMAATSCHAPPIJ *VERSTRAETEN B.V.

- Effective date: 20080630

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080101

2007-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20070630

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-06-27 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20070627

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-07-26 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060726

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-03-17 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2006-02-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-01-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051020

2005-08-17 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20050119

2005-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-02-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59911467 P 20050224

2005-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB LI NL

2005-01-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-01-19 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050119

2005-01-19 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050119

2003-12-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031030

2000-10-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE CH DE FR GB LI NL

2000-09-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000726

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB LI NL

2000-02-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI