Global patent index - EP 0978628 A3

EP 0978628 A3 2000-06-28 - Equipment for stowing and handling rods used in drilling rigs

Title (en)

Equipment for stowing and handling rods used in drilling rigs

Title (de)

Ausrüstung zur Lagerung und Handhabung von Bohrgestängen für Bohranlagen

Title (fr)

Equipement de stockage et de maniement de tiges de forage pour installations de forage

Publication

EP 0978628 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99113660 A

Priority

IT TO980687 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0978628A2] Equipment (8) for stowing and handling rods (5) used in drilling plants presenting a service well (7) for removing and placing the individual rods (5), and a control unit(8) for moving the rods (5) suitable for moving the rods from and to the service well (7) itself, and presenting, in turn, a preassembled tiltable loader which is able to move between a flat working position and a raised working position in order to arrange the rods (5) on an upright (B) of said service well (7); said equipment also presents a sliding positioning device (21) which is associated with the tiltable loader (13) in order to position each rod (5) in a set-up working position at a determined height along the upright (B) of the service well (7). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21B 19/14; E21B 19/15

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21B 19/15 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21B 19/155 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0978628 A2 20000209; EP 0978628 A3 20000628; IT 1303214 B1 20001102; IT TO980687 A1 20000207; IT TO980687 D0 19980806

INPADOC legal status

2002-01-31 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-12-19 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20001229

2001-03-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI