Global patent index - EP 0978638 A1

EP 0978638 A1 2000-02-09 - Phase changing device between a shaft and its driving pulley

Title (en)

Phase changing device between a shaft and its driving pulley

Title (de)

Einrichtung zur relativen Drehlagenänderung einer Welle zum Antriebsrad

Title (fr)

Dispositif de changement de phase entre un arbre et sa poulie d'entrainement

Publication

EP 0978638 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99112226 A

Priority

DE 19834843 A

Abstract (en)

An adjustable valve timing for an IC engine has the camshaft drive gear linked to the camshaft by a phase adjustment comprising fixed and movable vanes and by altering the relative hydraulic pressure in the chambers between the fixed and movable vanes. To prevent grit from being dragged under the movable vanes the inside wall of the outer housing is cut with a pattern of grooves (25). The grooves have sufficient depth and are spaced sufficiently close to collect grit. The movable vanes cover at least two grooves at any time.

Abstract (de)

Die erfindungsgemäße Einrichtung (3) zur relativen Drehlagenänderung einer Welle zum Antriebsrad hat eine Verstellvorrichtung mit zwei gegeneinander wirkenden Druckräumen (7a-7d bzw. 8a-8d), die über eine Druckmittelpumpe beaufschlagbar sind. Die Verstellvorrichtung besteht aus einem Innenteil mit Stegen (4a-4d), die durch Stege (6a-6d) eines Zellenrades gebildeten Räume in die entsprechenden Druckräume unterteilt. In die den Stegen des Innenteils zugewandten Umfangsfläche des Zellenrades sind eine Vielzahl von axial verlaufenden Vertiefungen (25) eingearbeitet, die zur Aufnahme von Schmutzpartikeln dienen, die durch das Druckmittel in die Druckräume eingetragen werden.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01L 1/344

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F16H 55/36 (2006.01); F01L 1/047 (2006.01); F01L 1/344 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01L 1/3442 (2013.01); F01L 2001/34436 (2013.01); F01L 2001/34479 (2013.01); Y10T 74/2102 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0781899 A1 19970702 - AISIN SEIKI [JP]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19834843 A1 20000203; CN 1089848 C 20020828; CN 1243911 A 20000209; EP 0978638 A1 20000209; EP 0978638 B1 20030917; ES 2204034 T3 20040416; JP 2000055171 A 20000222; KR 100516423 B1 20050923; KR 20000016991 A 20000325; US 6129063 A 20001010

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160628

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160627

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160620

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160614

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-06-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-06-17 [REG FR TQ] PARTIAL TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TQ

2011-04-27 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20110331 AND 20110406

2011-04-06 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20110310 AND 20110316

2009-11-27 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

2009-10-09 [REG FR TQ] PARTIAL TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TQ

2004-09-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040618

2004-07-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2204034

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-10-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59906996

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-10-23

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-10-08 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

2003-10-07 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2003-09-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2003-09-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-03-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030122

2000-10-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-08-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000614

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-02-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI