Global Patent Index - EP 0978642 A2

EP 0978642 A2 2000-02-09 - Control device of engine intake throttle valve

Title (en)

Control device of engine intake throttle valve

Title (de)

Steuervorrichtung für die Drosselklappe einer Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Appareil de commande pour le papillon de la soupape d'admission d'air dans un moteur à combustion

Publication

EP 0978642 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99110641 A

Priority

JP 22088598 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention offers a control device of an engine intake throttle valve (25) which optimizes a combustion condition of a combustion chamber (12) when an internal combustion engine (11) starts. The shorter an elapsed time after starting the engine, the higher a target throttle angle of the intake throttle valve (25) is. The target throttle angle changes to be lower in response to swift rising of the temperature of the combustion chamber (12), just after the engine (11) starts. Therefore the combustion condition of the combustion chamber (12) is optimized in the operation of starting the engine (11). Furthermore, the target throttle angle LSTRG is controlled according to the elapsed time after starting the engine (11), even though the coolant temperature changes slowly. Then, the combustion condition of the combustion chamber (12) is reliably optimized. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 41/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 9/02 (2006.01); F02D 11/10 (2006.01); F02D 41/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/064 (2013.01); F02D 11/105 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

JP 2519120 B2 19960731

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0978642 A2 20000209; EP 0978642 A3 20011205; EP 0978642 B1 20040310; DE 69915418 D1 20040415; DE 69915418 T2 20050224; JP 2000054893 A 20000222

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090611

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100602

2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100630

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110101

2011-03-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110228

2011-02-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100602

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090529

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090527

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-03-09 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2005-03-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041213

2004-10-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-04-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69915418 P 20040415

2004-04-07 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2004-03-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-03-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-08-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-02-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990609

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI