Global Patent Index - EP 0978644 A2

EP 0978644 A2 2000-02-09 - Internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 0978644 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99114048 A

Priority

DE 19835593 A

Abstract (en)

The engine has a cylinder base casing (1), a cylinder head casing (2) and a cylinder head cover (3). The head casing and head cover are fixed to each other by first fixing elements (4) and the base and head casings by second fixing elements (5). There are apertures (11) in the cylinder head cover. The second fixing elements can be inserted and fitted or removed. The assembly can thus be accomplished in different orders.

Abstract (de)

Bei einer Brennkraftmaschine mit einem Zylindergrundgehäuse 1, einem Zylinderkopfgehäuse 2 und einer Zylinderkopfhaube 3, wobei das Zylinderkopfgehäuse 2 und die Zylinderkopfhaube 3 mittels erster Befestigungselemente 4 aneinander befestigt sind und das Zylindergrundgehäuse 1 und das Zylinderkopfgehäuse 2 mittels zweiter Befestigungselemente 5 aneinander befestigt sind, wird vorgeschlagen, daß in der Zylinderkopfhaube 3 Öffnungen 11 vorgesehen sind und die zweiten Befestigungselemente 5 durch die Öffnungen 11 hindurch einsteck- und montierbar bzw. demontier- und herausnehmbar sind. Vorschlagsgemäß wird erreicht, daß das Zylindergrundgehäuse 1, das Zylinderkopfgehäuse 2 und die Zylinderkopfhaube 3 in beliebiger Reihenfolge montier- und demontierbar sind, was Zeit und Kosten spart. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02F 1/38; F02F 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02F 1/38 (2006.01); F02F 7/00 (2006.01); F02F 1/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02F 7/006 (2013.01); F02F 1/38 (2013.01); F02B 2275/18 (2013.01); F02F 2001/245 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0978644 A2 20000209; EP 0978644 A3 20001206; EP 0978644 B1 20050413; DE 19835593 A1 20000210

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160725

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160722

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160731

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-07-08 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Document: DE 59911893

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: AUDI A.G.

- Effective date: 20050731

2006-04-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060116

2006-03-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050731

2005-06-29 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050603

2005-05-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59911893 P 20050519

2005-04-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB

2005-04-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-05-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040405

2001-08-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE FR GB

2001-05-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010404

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB

2000-02-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI