Global Patent Index - EP 0978646 A2

EP 0978646 A2 2000-02-09 - Atmospheric air intake box for a diesel engine in a lorry

Title (en)

Atmospheric air intake box for a diesel engine in a lorry

Title (de)

Luftansauganlage für einen Dieselmotor in einem Lastkraftwagen

Title (fr)

Boîtier d'admission d'air atmosphérique pour moteur diesel dans un camion

Publication

EP 0978646 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99113763 A

Priority

DE 19835104 A

Abstract (en)

The air induction system includes a part surface (15) on the side (16) of the outside air induction box (11) facing the rear wall (14) of the cab, consisting of a studded surface (15') and a perforated surface (15) or of a perforated surface only, via which some of the outside air is sucked in. The air filter casing (12) includes an annular gap resonator on the clean air side.

Abstract (de)

Luftansauganlage für einen Dieselmotor in einem Lastkraftwagen, mit einem Rohluftansaugkasten, der eine seitliche Ansaugöffnung hat und hinter dem Fahrerhaus angeordnet ist, mit einem Luftfilter und Verbindungsleitungen bis hin zum Dieselmotor, wobei der Rohluftansaugkasten (11) auf der der Fahrerhausrückwand (14) zugewandten Seite (16) eine Teilfläche (15) aufweist, die aus einer genoppten Fläche (15') und einer perforierten Fläche (15'') oder nur aus einer perforierten Fläche (15'') besteht, über die ein Teil der Rohluft angesaugt wird, mit einem Luftfiltergehäuse (12), das einen Ringspaltresonator (17, 18) auf der Reinluftseite beinhaltet und der einen äußeren Leitungsanschluß (33) hat, der um 360° (Winkel) drehbar ist und mit einem anschließenden Teil der Reinluftleitung (19), das in Richtung Dieselmotor (20) als Venturidüse (19) ausgebildet ist, verbunden ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 35/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 35/10 (2006.01); F02M 35/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 35/164 (2013.01); F02M 35/10013 (2013.01); F02M 35/1216 (2013.01); F02M 35/1255 (2013.01); F02M 35/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0978646 A2 20000209; EP 0978646 A3 20000830; EP 0978646 B1 20031119; DE 19835104 A1 20000210

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160930

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160726

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160728

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160721

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-09-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160725

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-07-21 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: MAN TRUCK & BUS AG, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59907779

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110518

2011-05-20 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

2011-05-18 [REG NL TD] MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES OF PROPRIETORS OF PATENTS

- Ref Legal Event Code: TD

- Effective date: 20110420

2004-11-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040820

2004-07-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-02-03 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2003-12-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59907779

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-12-24

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-11-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT NL SE

2001-05-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR IT NL SE

2001-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001208

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7F 02M 35/16 A, 7F 02M 35/10 B, 7F 02M 35/14 B, 7B 60K 13/02 B

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT NL SE

2000-02-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI