Global Patent Index - EP 0978646 A3

EP 0978646 A3 2000-08-30 - Atmospheric air intake box for a diesel engine in a lorry

Title (en)

Atmospheric air intake box for a diesel engine in a lorry

Title (de)

Luftansauganlage für einen Dieselmotor in einem Lastkraftwagen

Title (fr)

Boîtier d'admission d'air atmosphérique pour moteur diesel dans un camion

Publication

EP 0978646 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99113763 A

Priority

DE 19835104 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0978646A2] The air induction system includes a part surface (15) on the side (16) of the outside air induction box (11) facing the rear wall (14) of the cab, consisting of a studded surface (15') and a perforated surface (15) or of a perforated surface only, via which some of the outside air is sucked in. The air filter casing (12) includes an annular gap resonator on the clean air side.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 35/16; B60K 13/02; F02M 35/10; F02M 35/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 35/10 (2006.01); F02M 35/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 35/164 (2013.01); F02M 35/10013 (2013.01); F02M 35/1216 (2013.01); F02M 35/1255 (2013.01); F02M 35/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0978646 A2 20000209; EP 0978646 A3 20000830; EP 0978646 B1 20031119; DE 19835104 A1 20000210

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160930

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160726

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160728

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160721

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-09-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160725

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-07-21 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: MAN TRUCK & BUS AG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: MAN NUTZFAHRZEUGE AG, 80995 MUENCHEN, DE

- Document: DE 59907779

- Effective date: 20110518

2011-05-20 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2011-05-18 [REG NL TD] MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES OF PROPRIETORS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20110420

2004-11-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040820

2004-07-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-02-03 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-12-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59907779 P 20031224

2003-11-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT NL SE

2001-05-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR IT NL SE

2001-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001208

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 02M 35/16 A, 7F 02M 35/10 B, 7F 02M 35/14 B, 7B 60K 13/02 B

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT NL SE

2000-02-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI