Global patent index - EP 0978647 A2

EP 0978647 A2 2000-02-09 - Atmospheric air intake box for a diesel engine in a lorry

Title (en)

Atmospheric air intake box for a diesel engine in a lorry

Title (de)

Rohluftansaugkasten für einen Dieselmotor in einem Lastkraftwagen

Title (fr)

Boîtier d'aspiration d'air atmosphérique pour moteur diesel dans un camion

Publication

EP 0978647 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99113948 A

Priority

DE 19835105 A

Abstract (en)

The outside air induction box is fixed to the rear wall of the cab. It has a part surface (13) on the side (12) facing the cab rear wall (18) consisting of a studded surface (15) and a perforated surface (14), or of a perforated surface alone. Outside air is sucked in at the side of the box as well as through its induction aperture (11), in which a cyclone separator may be fitted.

Abstract (de)

Rohluftansaugkasten für einen Dieselmotor in einem Lastkraftwagen mit Fahrerhaus, wobei der Rohluftansaugkasten an der Fahrerhausrückwand befestigt ist, dadurch gekennzeichnet, daß auf der der Fahrerhausrückwand (18) zugewandten Seite (12) eine Teilfläche (13) angeordnet ist, die aus einer genoppten (15) und einer perforierten Fläche (14) oder nur aus einer perforierten Fläche (14) besteht, über die, zusätzlich zur Rohluftansaugöffnung (16) seitlich des Rohluftansaugkastens (11), Rohluft angesaugt wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 35/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 35/14 (2006.01); F02M 35/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 35/10013 (2013.01); F02M 35/1216 (2013.01); F02M 35/14 (2013.01); F02M 35/164 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0978647 A2 20000209; EP 0978647 A3 20000830; EP 0978647 B1 20031210; DE 19835105 A1 20000210

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160721

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-09-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160725

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150930

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150731

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150630

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-07-21 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: MAN TRUCK & BUS AG, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59907996

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110518

2011-05-20 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

2011-05-18 [REG NL TD] MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES OF PROPRIETORS OF PATENTS

- Ref Legal Event Code: TD

- Effective date: 20110420

2004-12-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040913

2004-08-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-03-16 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2004-01-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59907996

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-01-22

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-12-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT NL SE

2001-05-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR IT NL SE

2001-01-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001125

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7F 02M 35/16 A, 7F 02M 35/10 B, 7F 02M 35/14 B, 7B 60K 13/02 B

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT NL SE

2000-02-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI