Global Patent Index - EP 0978649 A2

EP 0978649 A2 2000-02-09 - Fuel injection nozzle

Title (en)

Fuel injection nozzle

Title (de)

Kraftstoffeinspritzdüse

Title (fr)

Buse d'injection de combustible

Publication

EP 0978649 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99115711 A

Priority

DE 19835629 A

Abstract (en)

The nozzle has a nozzle body (12) with a tip (10) with two axially separate rows of injection holes (14,16) and a nozzle needle (20) axially movable in the nozzle body, whereby a conical surface (22) on the needle tip selectively frees and blocks the fuel path to the injection holes. A protruding insertion body (30) on the needle tip moves axially w.r.t.. the needle. In the closed state the conical surface is in contact with the first, upper row (14) of injection holes on the inside of the tip and a wedge body (32) is in contact with the inside of the tip between the rows of holes. After raising the conical surface to free the fuel path to the first row the wedge body frees the fuel path to the second, lower row (16) of holes.

Abstract (de)

Die Kraftstoffeinspritzdüse für Verbrennungsmotoren umfaßt einen Düsenkörper (12) mit einer Kuppe (10) mit zwei axial beabstandeten Reihen (14, 16) von Einspritzlöchern und eine bewegliche Düsennadel (20). An der Spitze der Düsennadel (20) ist ein axial beweglicher Einsatzkörper (30) mit einem Kegelkörper (32) angebracht, der von der Spitze der Düsennadel (29) vorsteht. Im Schließzustand des Einspritzventils liegt die abdichtende Konusfläche (22) der Düsennadel (20) in Strömungsrichtung des Kraftstoffs vor der ersten, oberen Reihe (14) von Einspritzlöchern an der Innenseite (24) der Kuppe (10) des Düsenkörpers (12) an und der Kegelkörper (32) zwischen der ersten, oberen Reihe (14) und der zweiten, unteren Reihe (16) von Einspritzlöchern. Nach dem Abheben der Konusfläche (22) der Düsennadel (20) von der Innenseite (24) der Kuppe (10) des Düsenkörpers (12) zur Freigabe des Kraftstoffwegs zu der ersten, oberen Reihe (14) der Einspritzlöcher gibt der Kegelkörper (32) den Kraftstoffweg zu der zweiten, unteren Reihe (16) der Einspritzlöcher verzögert frei. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 45/08; F02M 47/02; F02M 61/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 45/08 (2006.01); F02M 47/02 (2006.01); F02M 59/46 (2006.01); F02M 63/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 63/0026 (2013.01); F02M 45/086 (2013.01); F02M 47/027 (2013.01); F02M 2200/46 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0978649 A2 20000209; EP 0978649 A3 20030129; EP 0978649 B1 20040512

INPADOC legal status


2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100302

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090831

2010-05-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100430

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080813

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080822

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-04-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050806

2005-08-06 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050806

2005-08-06 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050806

2005-05-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050215

2004-12-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-12-30 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-08-05 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040805

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-06-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59909449 P 20040617

2004-06-16 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-06-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040512

2004-05-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-05-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-10-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-07-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030528

2003-04-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030217

2003-01-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-01-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI