Global patent index - EP 0978651 A1

EP 0978651 A1 2000-02-09 - Ion thruster

Title (en)

Ion thruster

Title (de)

Ionentriebwerk

Title (fr)

Propulseur ionique

Publication

EP 0978651 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99110818 A

Priority

DE 19835512 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19835512C1] A gas such as Xenon is fed through a frit (2) from a reservoir (1) into a chamber (3) designed as an ionizer surrounded by a permanent magnet (4) and a coiled induction cathode (6) connected to an oscillating circuit (5). An extraction anode (7) is fitted inside this chamber having gas inlets and outlets, in front of which are fitted an extraction cathode (8), a decelerating electrode (9) and a neutralizer designed as an electron emitter (10).

Abstract (de)

Ein als Ionentriebwerk für Satelliten und Raumflugkörper ausgebildetes elektrostatisches Triebwerk ist zur Neutralisation des austretenden Treibstoffionenstrahles mit einer Elektronenquelle ausgerüstet, bei der neben der Anode und einer gasdurchströmten Hohlkathode eine Zusatzelektrode vorgesehen ist. Letztere ist als Stift in der Längsachse des Kathodenrohres gehaltert und bewirkt, mit einen Zündimpuls beaufschlagt, die Zündung der Gasentladung zwischen Anode und Kathode und damit das Einsetzen des Elektronenstromes. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F03H 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F03H 99/00 (2009.01); F03H 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F03H 1/0025 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19835512 C1 19991216; CN 1121553 C 20030917; CN 1245868 A 20000301; DE 59913875 D1 20061109; EP 0978651 A1 20000209; EP 0978651 B1 20060927; JP 2000054951 A 20000222; RU 2243408 C2 20041227; US 6195980 B1 20010306

INPADOC legal status

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160628

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160518

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-06-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2007-10-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20070628

2007-04-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2007-01-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20070104

2006-11-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59913875

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2006-11-09

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2006-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2006-09-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-09-27 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060927

2006-08-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: EADS SPACE TRANSPORTATION GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-10-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2000-03-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000105

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-02-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI