Global Patent Index - EP 0978696 A1

EP 0978696 A1 2000-02-09 - Heating or refrigerating machine with evaporable heat transfer fluid

Title (en)

Heating or refrigerating machine with evaporable heat transfer fluid

Title (de)

Wärme-oder Kältemaschine mit einem verdampfbaren Wärmteträgerfluid

Title (fr)

Machine thermique ou frigorifique avec fluide caloporteur évaporable

Publication

EP 0978696 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98114545 A

Priority

EP 98114545 A

Abstract (en)

The machine has a vaporizable heat transfer medium fed to a container (1) with a porous structure holding a chemical absorption material via a controlled inlet valve (8), the vaporization space of the container coupled to a heat sink (3) via a compressor (2). The heat sink may be provided by a condenser (4).

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Wärme- oder Kältemaschine mit einem verdampfbaren Wärmeträgerfluid. Erfindungsgemäß enthält ein Behälter (1) in einer porösen Struktur ein Chemisorptionsmaterial und einen steuerbaren Einlaß (8) für Wärmeträgerfluid. Der Dampfraum dieses Behälters ist ausgangsseitig über einen Verdichter (2) mit einem Kondensator (3) verbunden. Vorzugsweise ist weiter ein Tank (7) vorgesehen, in den das im Kondensator (3) kondensierende Fluid gelangt und aus dem der Einlaß (8) gespeist wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25B 25/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25B 25/02 (2006.01); F25B 17/08 (2006.01); F25B 39/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25B 25/02 (2013.01); F25B 17/08 (2013.01); F25B 39/026 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 4305264 A1 19940825 - INST KATALIZA SIB OTDEL ROSSIJ [RU], et al

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0978696 A1 20000209; EP 0978696 B1 20030625; AT 243832 T 20030715; DE 59808826 D1 20030731

INPADOC legal status


2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070301

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060831

2007-06-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20070430

2007-05-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20070301

2007-04-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2007-03-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070301

2006-08-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-08-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-08-03 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060803

2006-02-10 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060210

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-10-03 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051003

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-09-27 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050927

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-09-23 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050923

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-09-23 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050923

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-08-03 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050803

2004-06-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040326

2004-02-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-07-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59808826

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-07-31

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-06-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI NL

2003-02-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BUERGER, HEINZ-DIETERVAKUUM- UND VERFAHRENSTECHNIK

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-02-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: INSTITUT KATALIZA SIBIRSKOGO OTDELENIJA ROSSIJSKOJ

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-10-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT CH DE FR IT LI NL

2000-09-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000731

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI NL

2000-02-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI