Global Patent Index - EP 0978747 A1

EP 0978747 A1 2000-02-09 - New ergonomic binoculars with zoom

Title (en)

New ergonomic binoculars with zoom

Title (de)

Neues ergonomisches Fernglas mit veränderlicher Vergrösserung

Title (fr)

Nouvelle lunette binoculaire ergonomique varifocale

Publication

EP 0978747 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98500186 A

Priority

EP 98500186 A

Abstract (en)

Binoculars made up of two cast aluminium bodies, equipped with respective sets of lenses, among which may be emphasized 21- millimetre objectives (5L), which allow an embodiment of small size and an optimalization of the unit's weight and size. Both bodies are connected to an axis joint for adjusting the distance between the user's eyes. A wheel in the axis joint allows accurate focusing. In one of the blocks, preferably the right-hand one, there is a lever for adjusting the zoom according to a range of pre-set magnifications. Each eyepiece is enclosed in a rubber protector that also improves tactile sensation and manageability. By turning an eyepiece, specifically the right-hand one, the dioptric scale may be adjusted. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G02B 23/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G02B 23/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G02B 23/18 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0978747 A1 20000209

INPADOC legal status


2003-09-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030319

2003-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021107

2001-03-14 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-28 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI

2000-11-15 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES LI

2000-11-08 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): ES

2000-10-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK LI

2000-10-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000808

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI