Global Patent Index - EP 0978760 A1

EP 0978760 A1 2000-02-09 - Novel reducing agents for use in thermographic recording materials

Title (en)

Novel reducing agents for use in thermographic recording materials

Title (de)

Neue Reduktionsmittel zur Verwendung in thermographischen Aufzeichnungsmaterialien

Title (fr)

Nouveaux agents réducteurs pour l'utilisation en matériaux d'enregistrements thermographiques

Publication

EP 0978760 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99202007 A

Priority

  • EP 99202007 A
  • EP 98202688 A

Abstract (en)

A substantially light-insensitive black and white monosheet thermographic recording material comprising a support and a thermosensitive element containing a substantially light-insensitive organic silver salt, a 1,2-dihydroxyphenyl-compound in thermal working relationship therewith and a binder, characterized in that the 1,2-dihydroxyphenyl-compound is represented by formula (I): <CHEM> where n is 0 or 1; R is -(C=O)R<1>, -(C=O)NR<1>R<2>, -CN, -SO3R<2>, -SO2R<2>, -SOR<2>, -SO2NR<2>R<3> or -PO3R<2>R<3>; R<1> is H or a substituted or unsubstituted alkyl group with 12 or less carbon atoms; and R<2> and R<3> are independently H or an alkyl, a substituted alkyl, an aryl or a substituted aryl group; and R<1> and R<2> together can provide the atoms to close a carbocyclic or heterocyclic ring; and R<2> and R<3> together can represent the atoms to close a carbocyclic or heterocyclic ring; and a recording process therefor.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03C 1/498

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03C 1/498 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03C 1/49827 (2013.01); G03C 1/4989 (2013.01); G03C 2200/45 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0978760 A1 20000209; EP 0978760 B1 20030702

INPADOC legal status


2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100101

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090623

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-03-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20100226

2010-02-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20090623

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080627

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080626

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080627

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-08-10 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2007-04-25 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2004-06-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040405

2004-02-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-08-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69909194

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-08-07

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-07-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB

2003-07-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2003-07-02 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030702

2003-02-05 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: THERMOGRAPHIC RECORDING MATERIALS

2002-02-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AGFA-GEVAERT

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-10-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: BE DE FR GB

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000809

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB

2000-02-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI