Global patent index - EP 0978804 A1

EP 0978804 A1 2000-02-09 - Output module for a ticket producing and delivering apparatus, in particular for transport tickets

Title (en)

Output module for a ticket producing and delivering apparatus, in particular for transport tickets

Title (de)

Ausgabemodul für eine Karten herstellende und -abgebende Vorrichtung, insbesondere für Fahrscheine

Title (fr)

Module de sortie pour un dispositif d'élaboration et de délivrance d'un ticket, notamment ticket de transport

Publication

EP 0978804 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99401688 A

Priority

FR 9808847 A

Abstract (en)

Device has a ticket outlet (12) with a ramp (15) inclined to the horizontal (PH) so that it defines an outlet direction for the tickets (15). A stopper (18) is positioned so that it holds a ticket (16a) on the ramp. The stopper (18) is arranged close to the ramp and is adapted so that it is elastic in all directions around its fixed end (18').

Abstract (fr)

Module (12) de sortie pour un dispositif d'élaboration et de délivrance d'un ticket (16), notamment ticket de transport, ledit dispositif comportant des moyens de transcription d'informations et des moyens d'entraînement dudit ticket vers ledit module (12) de sortie. Selon l'invention, le module (12) de sortie comporte, d'une part, une rampe (15) de sortie, inclinée par rapport au plan horizontal (PH), définissant une direction (d) de sortie pour ledit ticket (16), et, d'autre part, une butée (18, 18A) de retenue du ticket (16) sur la rampe (15) de sortie, disposée sensiblement en regard de ladite rampe (5), ladite butée (18, 18A) étant élastiquement flexible dans toutes les directions autour d'une extrémité (18', 18'A). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07B 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07B 5/00 (2006.01); G07B 5/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07B 5/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2781069 A1 20000114; FR 2781069 B1 20000811; EP 0978804 A1 20000209

INPADOC legal status

2003-07-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030103

2001-10-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010823

2000-10-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: BE DE ES GB IT

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000809

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES GB IT

2000-02-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI