Global Patent Index - EP 0978807 A1

EP 0978807 A1 2000-02-09 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CHECKING COIN FOR FORGERY

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CHECKING COIN FOR FORGERY

Title (de)

MÜNZPRÜFER

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE DETECTER UNE FAUSSE PIECE DE MONNAIE

Publication

EP 0978807 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99905308 A

Priority

  • JP 9900881 W
  • JP 6037798 A

Abstract (en)

A method of and apparatus for determining authenticity of coins based on difference in surface irregularity pattern of coins. A coin passage is inclined at a predetermined angle, and an exciting coil is arranged near one side wall of the coin passage such that the two magnetic poles of the exciting coil face the coin passage. Two receiving coils having substantially identical characteristics are arranged near the same passage wall such that they are electromagnetically coupled with the exciting coil. The exciting coil is excited at a predetermined frequency, and an influence of a demagnetizing field caused by eddy current induced on the surface of a coin is detected by the receiving coils. The level of the demagnetizing field varies depending on difference in surface irregularity pattern of coins, and thus authenticity of coins can be determined based on the difference in surface irregularity pattern. This can be attained with a simple, inexpensive arrangement. Even those coins which are almost identical in material, outside diameter and thickness can be discriminated from one another based on the difference in surface irregularity pattern. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07D 5/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07D 5/02 (2006.01); G07D 5/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07D 5/08 (2013.01); G07D 5/005 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0978807 A1 20000209; EP 0978807 A4 20020306; AU 2549499 A 19990915; AU 729021 B2 20010125; CA 2288297 A1 19990902; CA 2288297 C 20040427; JP 3660496 B2 20050615; JP H11250305 A 19990917; MY 123288 A 20060531; WO 9944176 A1 19990902

INPADOC legal status


2010-03-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20090901

2008-06-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KABUSHIKI KAISHA NIPPON CONLUX

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2004-11-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20041007

2002-03-06 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20020117

2002-03-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-02-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991026

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT