Global Patent Index - EP 0978815 A2

EP 0978815 A2 2000-02-09 - Advertising board with elongated elements

Title (en)

Advertising board with elongated elements

Title (de)

Werbetafel mit länglichen Einzelelementen

Title (fr)

Panneau pour reclame avec elements allongés

Publication

EP 0978815 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99115394 A

Priority

DE 19835475 A

Abstract (en)

The advertising panel is formed from a number of vertically hanging panels (2.1-2.n). These are suspended from a common drive shaft (5) that is connected by a worm and pinion gear to an electric motor (10). The tops of the panels have permanent magnets (3.1, 3.2). The magnets are detected by a sensor (13) and the output used to control the motor speed.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Werbetafel, bestehend aus einem Tragrahmen (1) und mehreren an diesem um parallele Achsen drehbar befestigen, insbesondere aufgehängten, länglichen Einzelelementen (2.1, ... 2.n), die durch wenigstens einen an dem Tragrahmen angebrachten Elektromotor (10) synchron antreibbar sind, so daß die Einzelelemente in wenigstens einer ihrer Ausrichtungen ein eine Werbebotschaft aufweisendes Bild erzeugen. Dabei weist ein Einzelelement (2.1, ... 2.n) an wenigstens einem seiner Enden (12.1) einen Permanentmagneten (3.1) aus. Am Tragrahmen ist im Bewegungsbereich des Permanentmagneten wenigstens ein Sensor (13) angebracht, der das Magnetfeld des Permanentmagneten erfaßt und ein Signal an eine Schaltvorrichtung für den oder die Elektromotoren abgibt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09F 11/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09F 11/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09F 11/025 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH ES FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0978815 A2 20000209; EP 0978815 A3 20000816; DE 19835475 A1 20000210

INPADOC legal status


2003-10-16 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2003-09-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030303

2001-05-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT CH ES FR IT LI

2001-03-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010115

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH ES FR IT LI

2000-02-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI