Global patent index - EP 0978848 A1

EP 0978848 A1 2000-02-09 - Method for charging a storage container and container for carrying out said method

Title (en)

Method for charging a storage container and container for carrying out said method

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Beladung eines Lagerbehälters und Lagerbehälter zur Durchführung des Verfahrens

Title (fr)

Procédé de remplissage d'un conteneur de stockage et conteneur adapté à cet usage

Publication

EP 0978848 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98114500 A

Priority

EP 98114500 A

Abstract (en)

Process for charging a storage vessel (1) with used fuel elements from nuclear power stations comprises filling bearing bushings (6, 7) each with a used fuel element and closing the bushings with a primary lid (9). A number of bushings (6, 7) are placed in the storage container and the container closed with a lid (5) having openings (12, 14). The bushings (6, 7) are raised after each other so that they punch through the openings (12, 14) with the head (13). A secondary lid (15) is fixed to the head (13). An Independent claim is also included for the storage vessel itself.

Abstract (de)

Das Verfahren ist insbesondere auf die Beladung eines Zwischenlagerbehälters mit abgebrannten Brennelementen aus Kernkraftwerken gerichtet. Lagerbüchsen (6,7) werden mit jeweils zumindest einem abgebrannten Brennelement befüllt, und die Lagerbüchsen (6,7) werden jeweils mit einem Primärdeckel (9) verschlossen. Eine Mehrzahl der Lagerbüchsen (6,7) wird in den Lagerbehälten (1) eingestellt, und der Lagerbehälter (1) wird mit einem zumindest eine Manipulieröffnung (12,14) aufweisenden Lagerbehälterdeckel (5) verschlossen. Die Lagerbüchsen (6,7) werden nacheinander jeweils so angehoben, daß sie mit ihrem Lagerbüchsenkopf (13) die Manipulieröffnung (12,14) durchgreifen, und es wird jeweils ein Sekundärdeckel (15) an dem Lagerbüchsenkopf (13) befestigt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G21F 5/008; G21F 5/06; G21F 5/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G21F 5/008 (2006.01); G21F 5/06 (2006.01); G21F 5/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G21F 5/12 (2013.01); G21F 5/008 (2013.01); G21F 5/06 (2013.01); G21Y 2002/302 (2013.01); G21Y 2002/402 (2013.01); G21Y 2002/60 (2013.01); G21Y 2004/30 (2013.01); G21Y 2004/303 (2013.01); G21Y 2004/40 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0978848 A1 20000209; EP 0978848 B1 20020605; DE 59804334 D1 20020711; ES 2175572 T3 20021116

INPADOC legal status

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: G.- FUR NUKLEAR-BEHALTER M.B.H. *GNB

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20050831

2006-11-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20050802

2006-05-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20060428

2006-04-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060428

2006-04-25 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2006-04-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2006-03-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060301

2005-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050831

2005-08-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050831

2005-08-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050831

2005-08-02 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050802

2005-08-02 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050802

2004-09-02 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040902

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-08-19 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040819

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-08-09 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040809

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-08-09 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040809

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-08-06 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040806

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-08-03 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040803

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-05-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030306

2002-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2175572

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-10-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-07-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59804334

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-07-11

2002-06-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-06-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: KELLER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE AG

2002-06-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR LI SE

2002-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20011119

2000-10-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: BE CH DE ES FR LI SE

2000-02-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990414

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR LI SE

2000-02-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI